Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1837348

EP1837348 - Water-absorbing resin and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Correction of patent specificationpublished on 08.01.2020  [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[2007/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Sakamoto, Shigeru
391-10, Shimoyobe Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1261 / JP
02 / Ikeuchi, Hiroyuki
14-12, Kitahirano-minamino-cho
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0887 / JP
03 / Machida, Sayaka
1-1-202, Honmachi
Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1114 / JP
 [2013/38]
Former [2007/39]01 / Sakamoto, Shigeru
391-10, Shimoyobe Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1261 / JP
02 / Ikeuchi, Hiroyuki
14-12, Kitahirano-minamino-cho
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0887 / JP
03 / Machida, Sayaka
1-1-202, Honmachi Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1114 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2019/43]
Former [2013/38]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [2007/39]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date07005807.821.03.2007
[2007/39]
Priority number, dateJP2006008390924.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006083909
[2007/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1837348
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1837348
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1837348
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1837348
Date:08.01.2020
[2020/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/44
[2007/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE [2019/43]
Former [2008/23]BE,  DE 
Former [2007/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wasserabsorbierendes Harz und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2007/39]
English:Water-absorbing resin and method for manufacturing the same[2007/39]
French:Résine absorbant l'eau et son procédé de fabrication[2007/39]
Examination procedure14.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/17]
27.03.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
09.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2013Fee for grant paid
02.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2019Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.06.2014  23.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Operations GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2014  23.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
30.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.01.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.02.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.06.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.09.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1589040  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-3 *;
 [E]EP1801128  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0050]; claims 4,8 *
OppositionEP1589040
 EP1280834
 EP0513780
 DE4020780
 EP0843690
 WO2004006971