Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1840144

EP1840144 - Crosslinkers for minimizing deterioration of polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.12.2010
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.01.2011  [2011/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Allen, Robert Arnold, Jr.
263 Edward Lane Catasauqua
PA 18032 / US
02 / James, Douglas Tobias
4833 Leeds Court Center Valley
PA 18034 / US
03 / Bell, Andrea Karen
1501 Fawn Lane Pottstown
PA 19465 / US
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date07005828.421.03.2007
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateUS2006038977127.03.2006         Original published format: US 389771
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1840144
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/18
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
TitleGerman:Vernetzer zur Minimierung der Verschlechterung von Polyurethanschaumstoffen[2007/40]
English:Crosslinkers for minimizing deterioration of polyurethane foams[2007/40]
French:Agents réticulants pour minimiser la détérioration des mousses de polyuréthane[2007/40]
Examination procedure18.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
11.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/02]
27.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1435365  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0014] * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP1018526  (CK WITCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-27 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US5707702  (BRADY JR ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * examples 1-3 * * column 23, line 5 - column 28, line 40 *