Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838129

EP1838129 - Method for configuring native VLAN and processing ethernet messages for a GPON system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2007/39]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Yang, Sulin, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
IP Dpt., Huawei Adm. Building, Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong Prov. 518129 / CN
02 / Zheng, Gang, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
IP Dpt., Huawei Adm. Building, Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong Prov. 518129 / CN
 [2007/39]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2007/39]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date07005959.722.03.2007
[2007/39]
Priority number, dateCN200613463022.03.2006         Original published format: CN200610034630
[2007/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1838129
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1838129
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838129
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/00, H04L12/46
[2009/08]
Former International [2007/39]H04Q11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Konfiguration eines nativen VLANs und zur Verarbeitung von Ethernet-Nachrichten für ein GPON-System[2007/39]
English:Method for configuring native VLAN and processing ethernet messages for a GPON system[2007/39]
French:Procédé de configuration de réseau local virtuel (vlan) natif et de traitement de messages Ethernet pour un système GPON[2007/39]
Examination procedure22.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/39]
24.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2010Fee for grant paid
25.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
CZ19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
EE19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
HU19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
LT19.05.2010
LV19.05.2010
MT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
PL19.05.2010
RO19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
SI19.05.2010
SK19.05.2010
TR19.05.2010
BG19.08.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
IS19.09.2010
PT20.09.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
CZ19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
EE19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
LT19.05.2010
LV19.05.2010
MT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
PL19.05.2010
RO19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
SI19.05.2010
SK19.05.2010
TR19.05.2010
BG19.08.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
IS19.09.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2013/42]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
CZ19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
EE19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
LT19.05.2010
LV19.05.2010
MT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
PL19.05.2010
RO19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
SI19.05.2010
SK19.05.2010
BG19.08.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
IS19.09.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2012/05]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
CZ19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
EE19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
LT19.05.2010
LV19.05.2010
MT19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
PL19.05.2010
RO19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
SI19.05.2010
SK19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
IS19.09.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2011/19]AT19.05.2010
BE19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
CZ19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
EE19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
IT19.05.2010
LT19.05.2010
LV19.05.2010
NL19.05.2010
PL19.05.2010
RO19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
SI19.05.2010
SK19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
IS19.09.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2011/06]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
FI19.05.2010
LT19.05.2010
LV19.05.2010
PL19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
SI19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
ES30.08.2010
IS19.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]  "B-PON OMCI support for IP, ISDN, video, VLAN tagging, VC cross-connections and other select functions; G.983.8 (03/03)", ITU-T STANDARD WITHDRAWN (W), INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA, CH, (20030316), no. G.983.8 (03/03), XP017404676 [X] 1-12 * page 29 *
 [A]  NIU LEHONG HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO ET AL, "Proposal of GPON in support of 802.1ad; D 578", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20060206), vol. STUDY GROUP 15, pages 1 - 3, XP017407693 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  "Gigabit-capable Passive Optical Networks (G-PON): ONT management and control interface specification; G.984.4 (06/04)", ITU-T STANDARD IN FORCE (I), INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA, CH, (20040613), no. G.984.4 (06/04), XP017401197 [A] 1-12 * page 17, rows 11,12 * * page 23 - page 24 * * page 65, rows 78 and 84 *
 [A]  IWATA A ET AL, "GLOBAL OPEN ETHERNET ARCHITECTURE FOR A COST-EFFECTIVE SCALABLE VPN SOLUTION", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20040101), vol. E87-B, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 142 - 151, XP001541242 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *