Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1972352

EP1972352 - Implantation device, method for producing and for applying the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2012
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2012  [2012/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stryker Trauma GmbH
Prof.-Küntscher-Str. 1-5
24232 Schönkirchen/Kiel / DE
[2008/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Procter, Philip
La Paisible Chemin du Pre Peilloud 304
Divonne les Bains 01220 / FR
 [2008/39]
Representative(s)Schindelmann, Peter , et al
C/o Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
D-80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/16]Schindelmann, Peter , et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2008/39]Schindelmann, Peter
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07006080.123.03.2007
[2008/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1972352
Date:24.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1972352
Date:10.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/50, A61L27/58, A61L27/40, A61B17/68
[2008/39]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2009/22]
Former [2008/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Implantationsvorrichtung, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verwendung[2008/39]
English:Implantation device, method for producing and for applying the same[2008/39]
French:Dispositif d'implantation, son procédé de production et d'application[2008/39]
Examination procedure13.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
25.03.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.05.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
14.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2011Fee for grant paid
09.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2011
Opposition(s)11.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2005249773  (MASPERO FABRIZIO A [CH] ET AL) [XD] 1-3,5,6,16,17 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * figure 1B *;
 [X]US2005182411  (DEMEO JOSEPH [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] *;
 [X]US6548569  (WILLIAMS SIMON F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9 * column 15, line 16 - line 29 * * column 27, line 37 - line 46 *;
 [X]WO9846164  (BOYAN BARBARA D [US]; NIEDERAUER GABRIELE [US]; KIESWETTER KRISTINE [U) [X] 1-3 * page 14, line 20 - line 27 *;
 [A]EP1609494  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] *