EP1840653 - Method for preparation of lithographic printing plate and lithographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oohashi, Hidekazu c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Aizawa, Takeo c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006254.2 | 27.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060099780 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006099780 | JP20060123825 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006123825 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840653 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/027, G03F7/031, G03F7/11, G03F7/30, G03F7/32 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G03F7/031 (EP,US);
G03F7/027 (EP,US);
G03F7/11 (EP,US);
G03F7/305 (EP,US);
G03F7/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Lithografie-Druckplatte und Lithografie-Druckplattenvorläufer | [2007/40] | English: | Method for preparation of lithographic printing plate and lithographic printing plate precursor | [2007/40] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une plaque d'impression lithographique et précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 06.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0249468 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * page 6, lines 39,40 * * page 6, line 45 ** pages 6-8; example 1 *; | [A]EP1349006 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-10 * pages 15-16; example 1 *; | [A]WO2005029187 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 31-33; examples 1-6 *; | [A]EP1591242 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, paragraphs 12,18 * * page 22, line 18 * * pages 56-57; example 1 *; | [PX]EP1695822 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-4,10 * page 52, paragraph 254 * * page 54, paragraph 277 * * pages 61-64; examples 11-15 * | by applicant | JPS62290705 | JPH08160615 | JPH10104835 | EP1695822 |