Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1840065

EP1840065 - Apparatus for preparing roll of paper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2010
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.2010  [2010/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Komori Corporation
11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Kameda, Yoshikazu
c/o Komori Corporation Sekiyado Plant 210 Kirigasaku
Noda-Shi Chiba / JP
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/40]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date07006545.329.03.2007
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateJP2006009642531.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006096425
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1840065
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1840065
Date:22.07.2009
[2009/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/29, B65H19/10
[2007/40]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/13]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Papierrolle[2007/40]
English:Apparatus for preparing roll of paper[2007/40]
French:Appareil de préparation de rouleau de papier[2007/40]
Examination procedure23.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/29]
04.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6227088  (CESTONARO JEAN [CH], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,14-17 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 53 * * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 38; figures 1-9 * [A] 2,3,6,7,18;
 [XA]US4821971  (WATANABE TAKEMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,9-12,14-16 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 62 * * column 7, line 16 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-10 * [A] 2,3,6-8;
 [A]WO9313004  (JOHANSSON ARNE [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 32 - page 9, line 36; figures 1-4 *