Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1848081

EP1848081 - Installation unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 15.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
95111 Rehau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schork, Rainer
Birkenweg 12
91330 Bammersdorf / DE
02 / Mordhorst, Johannes
Hannes-Pries-Str. 21
24232 Schönkirchen / DE
03 / Schinzel, Hartmut
Gottersdorfer Strasse 9
95213 Münchberg / DE
04 / Weerts, Carsten
Masurenplatz 4a
31515 Wunstorf / DE
Application number, filing date07006628.730.03.2007
Priority number, dateDE200611918521.04.2006         Original published format: DE 10619185
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2007
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
English:Installation unit[2007/43]
French:Unité d'installation[2007/43]
Examination procedure30.08.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/03]
03.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/11]
30.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0677899  (TEHALIT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,11-15,21 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE4111285  (KLEINHUIS HERMANN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,11-16,18-21 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004014340  (VARGAS ANTONIO J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15,21 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3507896  (ACKERMANN ALBERT GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *