blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1843145

EP1843145 - Paint defect detecting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/41]Illuminating method in paint defect detecting machine
[2009/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chuo Electronic Measurement Co., Ltd
10-25, Ushitahigashi 2-chome Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima / JP
[2007/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Kaya, Toshiyuki
3-1, Kinya-cho, Minami-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date07006685.730.03.2007
[2007/41]
Priority number, dateJP2006010150703.04.2006         Original published format: JP 2006101507
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1843145
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1843145
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2007
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/57, G01N21/95, B62D65/00, G01B11/30
[2007/41]
CPC:
G01N21/9515 (EP,US); B62D65/005 (EP,US); G01B11/303 (EP,US);
G01N21/57 (EP,US); G01N21/8806 (EP,US); B05B15/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/41]
TitleGerman:Farbfehlerdetektionsgerät[2009/35]
English:Paint defect detecting machine[2009/35]
French:Machine de détection des défauts de peinture[2009/35]
Former [2007/41]Beleuchtungsverfahren in Farbfehlerdetektionsgerät
Former [2007/41]Illuminating method in paint defect detecting machine
Former [2007/41]Procédé d'illumination dans une machine de détection des défauts de peinture
Examination procedure28.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
02.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2010Fee for grant paid
15.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
HU02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
ES13.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
[2013/46]
Former [2013/45]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
HU02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2013/44]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2013/42]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2012/05]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/19]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/06]AT02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US5477268  (SHIMBARA YOSHIMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 14 * * column 15, line 20 - line 39; figures 1-3,21 *;
 [A]EP1092973  (PERCEPTRON INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2002136009  (YONEDA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1327852  (CT SVILUPPO MATERIALI SPA [IT]) [A] 1* paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2004198403  (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS5477268
 US2002136009
 EP1327852
 JP2004198403
 JP2005148047
 JP2005291842
 JP2005291843
 JP2005291844
 JP2005291845
 JP2005315841
 JP2006184080
 JP2006343185
 EP1992973
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.