Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1844914

EP1844914 - Method for making three-dimensional preforms using electroluminescent devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.2010
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American GFM Corporation
1200 Cavalier Boulevard
Chesapeake VA 23323 / US
[2007/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Buckley, Daniel T.
1232 Russellville Road
Shrewsbury, VT 05738 / US
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Babeluk, Michael
Patentanwalt
Florianigasse 26/3
1080 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]Babeluk, Michael
Patentanwalt, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17
1150 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date07007589.013.04.2007
[2007/42]
Priority number, dateUS2006040332713.04.2006         Original published format: US 403327
[2007/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1844914
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1844914
Date:04.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:B29B11/16, B29C35/08, B29C70/30
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von dreidimensionalen Vorformen mittels elektrolumineszenter Vorrichtungen[2007/42]
English:Method for making three-dimensional preforms using electroluminescent devices[2007/42]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication de préformes tridimensionnelles à l'aide de dispositifs électroluminescents[2007/42]
Examination procedure17.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/22]
07.05.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2009Fee for grant paid
28.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
MT04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
TR04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
GR05.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
IE13.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
HU05.05.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]CY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
MT04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
GR05.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
IE13.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
HU05.05.2010
Former [2011/41]CY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
MT04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
GR05.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
IE13.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/22]CY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
MT04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
GR05.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
IE13.04.2010
IT13.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/19]CY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
GR05.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
IE13.04.2010
IT13.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/06]CY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
GR05.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/42]CY04.11.2009
CZ04.11.2009
DK04.11.2009
EE04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
RO04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
SK04.11.2009
BG04.02.2010
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
Former [2010/27]CY04.11.2009
FI04.11.2009
LT04.11.2009
LV04.11.2009
PL04.11.2009
SI04.11.2009
IS04.03.2010
PT04.03.2010
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP1749631  (AMERICAN GFM CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-10,12-17,19,20,22-25 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US5217654  (BUCKLEY DANIEL T [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,12-17,23-25 * column 5, line 29 - line 68 * [Y] 3,5,10,11,18;
 [DXY]US5487853  (BUCKLEY DANIEL T [US]) [DX] 1,2,4,8,9,12-14,23-25 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 50 * [Y] 3,5,10,11;
 [XY]US6004123  (BUCKLEY DANIEL T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,23,24 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 66 * * column 6, line 20 - line 23 * [Y] 3,5,11;
 [Y]US2004021255  (BILANIN ALAN J [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,11,18,21,22 * paragraph [0035] *;
 [XY]US5192387  (BUCKLEY DANIEL T [US]) [X] 19 * column 4, line 35 - line 61 * [Y] 21,22;
 [Y]EP0558366  (COOK COMPOSITES & POLYMERS [US]) [Y] 10 * claim 1 *