EP1847792 - Method for manufacturing a heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xenesys Inc. 20-23 Nisikigaoka 3-chome, Uozumi-Cho Akashi-shi Hyougo-ken / JP | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuzaki, Toyoaki c/o Xenesys Inc. 20-23, Nisikigaoka 3-chome, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyougo-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Tao c/o Xenesys Inc. 20-23, Nisikigaoka 3-chome, Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi, Hyougo-ken / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007614.6 | 13.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | JP20060116702 | 20.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006116702 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847792 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, B23K20/02, B23K20/14 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
B23K20/02 (EP,US);
F28D9/00 (KR);
B23K20/14 (EP,US);
F28F3/00 (KR);
B23K2101/14 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
F28F2275/061 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/27] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wärmetauschers | [2007/43] | English: | Method for manufacturing a heat exchanger | [2007/43] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un échangeur de chaleur | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03033983 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0187529 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]DE19801374 (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1415748 (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE10359807 (ZEBRAS ZENTRUM FUER ENTWICKLUN [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - * |