Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1845335

EP1845335 - Size difference measuring method and size difference measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
[2016/37]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
MITUTOYO CORPORATION
20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoyama, Yuichiro
Mitutoyo Corporation
430-1, Kamiyokoba
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP
 [2016/37]
Former [2007/42]01 / Yokoyama, Yuichiro
Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/37]
Former [2007/42]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07007630.213.04.2007
[2007/42]
Priority number, dateJP2006011144714.04.2006         Original published format: JP 2006111447
[2007/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1845335
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1845335
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1845335
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/02, G01B9/02
[2007/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2016/37]
Former [2009/43]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2007/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen des Größenunterschieds[2007/42]
English:Size difference measuring method and size difference measuring apparatus[2007/42]
French:Procédé de mesure de différence de taille et appareil de mesure de différence de taille[2007/42]
Examination procedure14.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/40]
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2016Fee for grant paid
27.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2016
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]  G. ROBLIN, Y. SOUCHE, "INTERFÉROMÈTRE A POLARISATION DESTINÉ A LA DILATOMÉTRIE DIFFÉRENTIELLE", NOUV. REV. OPTIQUE, (1974), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 287 - 293, XP002508750 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 287 - page 289 * * figures 1-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0335-7368/5/5/303
 [X]  GOLUBKOVA V P ET AL, "New interferometer for measuring block gauges", MEASUREMENT TECHNIQUES, CONSULTANTS BUREAU. NEW YORK, US, (19640101), vol. 8, ISSN 0543-1972, pages 672 - 674, XP009110207 [X] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  KURIYAMA ET AL, "Development of a New Interferometric Measurement System for Determining the Main Characteristics of Gauge Blocks", CIRP ANNALS, TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, BERNE, CH, (20060101), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 563 - 566, XP022135514 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-8506(07)60483-1
 [A]  HIRAI A ET AL, "Remote calibration of end standards using a low-coherence tandem interferometer with an optical fiber", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030101), vol. 215, no. 1-3, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 25 - 30, XP004399187 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-4018(02)02196-X
 [A]  KAI-YU CHENG, CHUNG-CHI TANG, WEI-CHENG CHANG, CHAO-JUNG CHEN, TSAI-FU WU, JUNG-TSUNG CHOU, "Method of continuous end standard measurement utilizing laser interferometer", PROC. OF SPIE, (20040804), vol. 5532, pages 364 - 371, XP002508751 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 365 - page 368 * * figures 1-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.559455
by applicant   "Interférométre a Polarisation Destine a la Dilatometrie Différentielle", NOUV. REV. OPTIQUE, (1974), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 287 - 293,
    V. P. GOLUBKOVA ET AL., "New Interferometer for Measuring Block Gauges", IZMERITEL'NAYA TEKHNIKA, (196408), pages 14 - 16,
    Y. KURIYAMA ET AL., "Development of a New Interferometric Measurement System for Determining the Main Characteristics of Gauge Blocks", CIRP ANNALS, TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, (20060101), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 563 - 566,
    HIRAI A. ET AL., "Remote calibration of end standards using a low-coherence tandem interferometer with an optical fiber", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (20030101), vol. 215, no. 1-3, pages 25 - 30,
    KAI-YU CHENG ET AL., "Method for continuous end standard measurement utilizing laser interferometer", PROC. OF SPIE, (20040804), vol. 5523, pages 364 - 371,