Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1852807

EP1852807 - Method for personalising electronic data carriers and personalisation device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Change - applicantpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/34]For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Former [2007/45]For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Finkenzeller, Klaus
Ahornstrasse 19
85774 Unterföhring / DE
02 / Ebner, Claus Dr.
Pappelallee 12e
80995 München / DE
 [2007/45]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/51]
Former [2010/36]Vierheilig, Achim , et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date07008260.724.04.2007
[2007/45]
Priority number, dateDE2006102022702.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006020227
[2007/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1852807
Date:07.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1852807
Date:04.06.2008
[2008/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1852807
Date:18.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06K13/07, G06K17/00, G06K19/077
[2008/23]
Former International [2007/45]G06K13/07, G06K17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Personalisierung elektronischer Datenträger und Personalisierungsautomat dafür[2007/45]
English:Method for personalising electronic data carriers and personalisation device therefor[2007/45]
French:Procédé de personnalisation de support de données électronique et automate de personnalisation correspondant[2007/45]
Examination procedure05.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/03]
15.06.2010Fee for grant paid
15.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP10003017.0  / EP2221747
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.2012   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/46]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2012   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
26.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.03.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.04.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1258/15
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.04.2007
CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
IT18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
MT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
TR18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
AT24.04.2012
LU24.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
IT18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
MT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
TR18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
AT24.04.2012
LU24.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2014/21]CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
IT18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
MT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
TR18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
AT24.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2013/36]CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
IT18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
MT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
AT24.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2013/35]CY18.01.2012
CZ18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
EE18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
IT18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
MT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
RO18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
SI18.01.2012
SK18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/41]CY18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/39]FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
LV18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/37]FI18.01.2012
LT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
PL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/36]LT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
Former [2012/35]LT18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
BG18.04.2012
IS18.05.2012
Former [2012/34]LT18.01.2012
IS18.05.2012
Former [2012/33]LT18.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1507231  (DATACARD CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13,22,23 * paragraphs [0017] , [0021]; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE19943285  (RUHLAMAT AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHN [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *
by applicantDE19943285
 EP0984389
 EP0797167
 EP1507231