Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1850423

EP1850423 - System for unmating a connector pair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
[2012/42]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3 avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Crippa, Roberto
Via Italia 2/b
23845 Costa Masnaga (Lecco) / IT
02 / Maltecca, Roberto
Via Pirandello, 7
20060 Pozzuolo Martesana (Milano) / IT
03 / Omati, Roberto
Via Garibaldi, 13/A
20060 Gessate (Milano) / IT
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)Mildner, Volker
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Intellectual Property Business Group
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2013/31]
Former [2009/26]Urlichs, Stefan , et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/21]Urlichs, Stefan , et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Corporate Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2007/44]Menzietti, Domenico , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date07008293.824.04.2007
[2007/44]
Priority number, dateIT2006MI0082426.04.2006         Original published format: IT MI20060824
[2007/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1850423
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1850423
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/629, H01R12/71, H01R13/633
[2012/29]
Former International [2007/44]H01R13/629, H01R13/633, H01R12/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/44]
TitleGerman:System zur Entkopplung eines Steckerpaares[2007/44]
English:System for unmating a connector pair[2007/44]
French:Système pour séparer une paire de connecteurs[2007/44]
Examination procedure18.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/23]
14.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2012Fee for grant paid
07.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2008
Opposition(s)18.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.04.2007
AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE24.04.2013
LU24.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE24.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2015/13]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE24.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/20]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE24.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
Former [2013/20]LT17.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2005029936  (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,12,13,16,18,20,21 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,6,8,14,15,17,19;
 [X]GB2115239  (MITEL CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6083022  (WALKUP WILLIAM B [US]) [Y] 3,4,6,14,15,17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1587179  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [Y] 8,19 * claim 1 *