Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1852136

EP1852136 - Use of a dialysis membrane for preparing a haemodialysis unit for reducing blood free light chain concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Magistratsvägen 16
226 43 Lund / SE
For all designated states
The Binding Site Group Limited
PO Box 11712 Birmingham
B14 4ZB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22 643 Lund / SE
For all designated states
The Binding Site Group Limited
PO Box 11712 Birmingham
B14 4ZB / GB
Former [2007/45]For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22 643 Lund / SE
For all designated states
The Binding Site Limited
PO Box 11712 Birmingham
B14 4ZB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Bradwell, Arthur Randell
P.O. Box 11712
Birmingham West Midlands B14 4ZB / GB
02 / Goehl, Herrmann
Rosengarten 2
72406 Bisingen-Zimmern / DE
03 / Storr, Markus
Achterwaldstrasse 28
70794 Filderstadt / DE
 [2007/45]
Representative(s)Hornung, Veronika Margot
c/o Gambro Dialysatoren GmbH
Holger-Crafoord-Strasse 26
72379 Hechingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/45]Hornung, Veronika Margot
c/o Gambro Dialysatoren GmbH Holger-Crafoord-Strasse 26
72379 Hechingen / DE
Application number, filing date07008588.127.04.2007
[2007/45]
Priority number, dateGB2006000844427.04.2006         Original published format: GB 0608444
[2007/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1852136
Date:07.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/16, A61M1/34, B01D69/08
[2007/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/45]
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer Dialysemembran zur Herstellung eines Hämodialysegerätes zur Verringerung der Konzentration der freien Leichtketten in Blut[2007/46]
English:Use of a dialysis membrane for preparing a haemodialysis unit for reducing blood free light chain concentration[2007/45]
French:Utilisation d'une membrane de dialyse pour la préparation d'une unité d'hémodialyse pour réduire la concentration en chaînes légères libres du sang[2007/46]
Former [2007/45]Verwendung einer Dialysemembran zur Herstellung eines Hämodialysegerätes zur Verringerung der blutlosen Leichtkettenkonzentration
Former [2007/45]Utilisation d'une membrane de dialyse pour la préparation d'une unité d'hémodialyse pour réduire la concentration en chaînes légères du sang
Examination procedure27.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/45]
19.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/10]
24.10.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/10]
Appeal following examination30.11.2009Appeal received No.  T0773/10
03.02.2010Statement of grounds filed
24.10.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
24.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2012/32]
Former [2008/48]ID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:20.10.2008
[2012/32]
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO2004056460  (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al) [DX] 1-4 * page 6, lines 9-17; claims 1,2,7,8,11 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]  - MACHIGUCHI TOSHIHIKO ET AL, "Efficacy of haemodiafiltration treatment with PEPA dialysis membranes in plasma free light chain removal in a patient with primary amyloidosis", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200209), Database accession no. PREV200200527972, XP002446678 [Y] 5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, (200209), vol. 17, no. 9, ISSN 0931-0509, pages 1689 - 1691, [Y] 5 * page 1689, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 1690, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [PX]  - HUTCHISON COLIN A ET AL, "Efficient removal of immunoglobulin free light chains by hemodialysis for multiple myeloma: in vitro and in vivo studies.", DATABASE MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200703), Database accession no. NLM17229909, XP009088222 [PX] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2006080821
 [PX]  - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY : JASN MAR 2007, (200703), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 1046-6673, pages 886 - 895, [PX] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DRÜEKE T B, "Beta2-microglobulin and amyloidosis.", DATABASE MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (2000), Database accession no. NLM10737162, XP002446680 [A] 1,5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - NEPHROLOGY, DIALYSIS, TRANSPLANTATION : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE EUROPEAN DIALYSIS AND TRANSPLANT ASSOCIATION - EUROPEAN RENAL ASSOCIATION 2000, (2000), vol. 15 Suppl 1, ISSN 0931-0509, pages 17 - 24, [A] 1,5 * page 19, column 2, paragraph 2 *