Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1849406

EP1849406 - Pediatric adapter for transillumination [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mullani, Nizar
719 Santa Maria
Sugar Land TX 77478 / US
[2007/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
Former [2007/44]Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 15 80
59705 Arnsberg / DE
Application number, filing date07008810.927.04.2007
[2007/44]
Priority number, dateUS20060795558P28.04.2006         Original published format: US 795558 P
[2007/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1849406
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1849406
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[2007/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/28]
Former [2007/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Pädiatrischer Adapter zur Diaphanoskopie[2007/44]
English:Pediatric adapter for transillumination[2007/44]
French:Adaptateur pédiatrique pour transillumination[2007/44]
Examination procedure02.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/24]
03.05.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
19.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2014Fee for grant paid
02.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10015827.8   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 20.12.2010
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2008
Opposition(s)15.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6280032  (KOLTA PETER [HU]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 4, lines 46-48 * * column 6, lines 3-7 * * figures 3,5 * [Y] 1,5,7;
 [XY]US5788518  (WACHTER PETER F [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * figure 6 * [Y] 10;
 [Y]EP0672379  (WELCH ALLYN INC [US]) [Y] 5,10 * figure 2 *
 [Y]  JEFFREY LINDSEY, "No More Stab-in-the-Dark IV Sticks!", JOURNAL OF EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES, (200510), vol. 30, no. 10, pages 90 - 90, XP002449266 [Y] 1,7 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS6923762
 US2004174525