Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1841268

EP1841268 - Access of a mobile station to a random access channel in dependence of its user class [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/40]Method for allocating access rights for a telecommunications channel to subscriber stations of a telecommunications network and subscriber station
[2010/01]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
23.03.2018New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
[2018/17]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Ralf
Langes Feld 3
31199 Diekholzen / DE
02 / Hans, Martin
Lavesring 10
31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE
03 / Kowalewski, Frank, Dr.
Fasanenstrasse 19
82008 Unterhaching / DE
04 / Laumen, Josef
Hohenwaldeckstrasse 19
81541 München / DE
05 / Schmidt, Gunnar
Kapellenweg 15
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
06 / Lechner, Detlef
Rumeyplan 3
12101 Berlin-Tempelhof / DE
07 / Schulz, Holger
Arcostrasse 18
10587 Berlin / DE
 [2010/11]
Former [2007/48]01 / Fischer, Ralf
Langes Feld 3
31199 Diekholzen / DE
02 / Hans, Martin
Lavesring 10
31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE
03 / Kowalewski, Frank, Dr.
Fasanenstrasse 19
82008 Unterhaching / DE
04 / Laumen, Josef
Hohenwaldeckstrasse 19
81541 M ̈nchen / DE
05 / Schmidt, Gunnar
Kapellenweg 15
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
06 / Lechner, Detlef
Rumeyplan 3
12101 Berlin-Tempelhof / DE
07 / Schulz, Holger
Arcostrasse 18
10587 Berlin / DE
Former [2007/40]01 / Fischer, Ralf
Vor dem Eichberg 10
31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE
02 / Hans, Martin
Spandauer Weg 9
31141 Hildesheim / DE
03 / Kowalewski, Frank
Schierke 16
38228 Salzgitter / DE
04 / Laumen, Josef
Hansering 56
31141 Hildesheim / DE
05 / Schmidt, Gunnar
Ziegenberg 6
38304 Wolfenbuettel / DE
06 / Lechner, Detlef
Rumeyplan 3
12101 Berlin-Tempelhof / DE
07 / Schulz, Holger
Schlossstrasse 37
14059 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)Molnia, David , et al
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[2018/17]
Former [2010/08]Molnia, David , et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2007/40]Gigerich, Jan , et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date07009265.515.02.2000
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateDE1999101023908.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910239
[2007/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1841268
Date:03.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1841268
Date:08.04.2009
[2009/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1841268
Date:17.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/11]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1841268
Date:25.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/10
[2009/15]
Former International [2007/40]H04Q7/38, H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2018/17]
Former [2007/40]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Zugriff einer Mobilstation auf einen wahlfreien Zugriffskanal in Abhängigkeit ihrer Nutzerklasse[2010/01]
English:Access of a mobile station to a random access channel in dependence of its user class[2010/01]
French:Accès d'une station mobile à un canal d'accès aléatoire en dépendance de sa classe d'utilisateur[2010/01]
Former [2007/40]Verfahren zur Vergabe von Zugriffsrechten auf einen Telekommunikationskanal an Teilnehmerstationen eines Telekommunikationsnetzes und Teilnehmerstation
Former [2007/40]Method for allocating access rights for a telecommunications channel to subscriber stations of a telecommunications network and subscriber station
Former [2007/40]Procédé d'attribution de droits d'accès à un canal de télécommunication à des postes d'abonnés d'un réseau de télécommunication et poste d'abonné
Examination procedure08.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
19.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2009Observations by third parties
20.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2010Fee for grant paid
03.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2012Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00916749.5  / EP1186189
Divisional application(s)EP10002772.1  / EP2194750
EP10002773.9  / EP2200389
EP10184367.0  / EP2309815
EP10185183.0  / EP2375843
EP10185904.9  / EP2375844
EP12194484.7  / EP2575405
EP12194487.0  / EP2579666
EP14177020.6  / EP2793524
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Microsoft Mobile Oy
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone GmbH
Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/24]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Microsoft Mobile Oy
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone GmbH
Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/42]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2014/26]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2013/31]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  26.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2013/03]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
DeTeMobil Deutsche Telekom MobilNet GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
 06  07.12.2012  07.12.2012  INTERVENTION
APPLE COMPUTER INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2084 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2012/26]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010   
DeTeMobil Deutsche Telekom MobilNet GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010   
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Former [2011/14]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010   
DeTeMobil Deutsche Telekom MobilNet GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Siegert, Georg
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010   
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 05  18.02.2011  02.03.2011  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone D2 GmbH
Am Seestern 1
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Former [2011/04]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010  22.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  17.12.2010   
DeTeMobil Deutsche Telekom MobilNet GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.12.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Siegert, Georg
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  17.12.2010   
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2010/33]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2010   
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
25.01.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.03.2011Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2011Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.06.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.04.2012Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
11.02.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.02.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.03.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition11.04.2014Appeal received No.  T0767/14
20.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
28.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0767/14
18.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
28.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0767/14
17.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
11.04.2014Appeal received No.  T0767/14
12.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
23.05.2012Appeal received No.  T1282/12
10.07.2012Statement of grounds filed
20.07.2012Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M05) [2012/29]
14.12.2012Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2012/50]
07.03.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
27.10.2014Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2014/44]
21.11.2014Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2014/47]
07.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
18.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.09.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
03.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:07.05.2008
[2008/36]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4707832  (GLENN RAYMOND R ET AL) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 13 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 65 * * figures 1,13 *;
 [A]WO9719525  (MOTOROLA INC) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, lines 7-17 * * page 4, line 2 - line 20 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 26 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9115069  (SF2 CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, line 9 - line 23 * * page 6, line 32 - page 13, line 6 * * figures 1A,1B *
by applicantDE19838832
 US4707832
 WO9719525
 WO9823109
 EP0765096
otherDE20024006U
 WO0054534