Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1860755

EP1860755 - Magnet retaining arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Energy Power Conversion UK Limited
Boughton Road
Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB
[2013/16]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Converteam UK Ltd
Boughton Road Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
Converteam Ltd
Boughton Road Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Clark, Paul Eaton
65 Edyvean Close
Rugby
Warwickshire CV22 6LD / GB
 [2011/39]
Former [2007/48]01 / Clark, Paul Eaton
65 Edyvean Close Rugby
Warwickshire CV22 6LD / GB
Representative(s)Serjeants LLP
Dock
75 Exploration Drive
Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Serjeants
25 The Crescent King Street
Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB
Former [2007/48]Serjeants
25 The Crescent King Street
Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB
Application number, filing date07010082.121.05.2007
[2007/48]
Priority number, dateGB2006001057327.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0610573
[2007/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1860755
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1860755
Date:18.08.2010
[2010/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1860755
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27
[2007/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/48]
TitleGerman:Magnetaufnahmevorrichtung[2007/48]
English:Magnet retaining arrangement[2007/48]
French:Dispositif de retenue d'aimant[2007/48]
Examination procedure19.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/14]
01.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2011Fee for grant paid
26.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2012  10.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  25.06.2012   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 03  28.06.2012  11.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Wind Power A/S
Borupvej 16
7330 Brande / DK
Opponent's representative
Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2012  10.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  25.06.2012   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 03  28.06.2012  11.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Wind Power A/S
Borupvej 16
7330 Brande / DK
Opponent's representative
Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2012  10.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  25.06.2012   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 03  28.06.2012  11.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Wind Power A/S
Borupvej 16
7330 Brande / DK
Opponent's representative
Aspacher, Karl-Georg
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2012/32]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2012   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Plett, Oliver
Siemens AG CT IP W
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
DE-81739 München / DE
 02  25.06.2012   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 Munich / DE
 03  28.06.2012   
Siemens Wind Power A/S
Borupvej 16
7330 Brande / DK
Opponent's representative
Aspacher, Karl-Georg
Siemens AG CT IP SV Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2012/31]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2012   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Plett, Oliver
Siemens AG CT IP W
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
DE-81739 München / DE
25.07.2012No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
19.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.06.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 02
17.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.08.2015Appeal received
19.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1836/15
15.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
DK31.05.2014
HU22.05.2015
FI21.05.2016
SE22.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
IT21.05.2017
ES22.05.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/28]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
DK31.05.2014
HU22.05.2015
FI21.05.2016
SE22.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
IT21.05.2017
Former [2017/21]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
DK31.05.2014
HU22.05.2015
FI21.05.2016
SE22.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
Former [2017/10]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
DK31.05.2014
HU22.05.2015
FI21.05.2016
SE22.05.2016
Former [2016/24]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
DK31.05.2014
HU22.05.2015
Former [2015/22]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
DK31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE21.05.2014
Former [2014/27]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
LU21.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/35]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
MT28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/23]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT28.09.2011
BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/08]LT28.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US4792712  (STOKES VIJAY K [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,18 * column 3, line 39 - line 44; figure 7 * * column 7, line 6 *;
 [Y]JP2006034024  (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO02103882  (ABB OY [FI]; MALMBERG JUKKA [FI]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] *