Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1825851 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 370
30.05.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2015 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
27.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
22.07.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
25.06.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
29.05.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
29.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.01.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.01.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
22.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
22.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
22.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.07.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.03.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.08.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
06.08.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
06.08.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 40
11.03.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
07.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.02.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.01.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
07.12.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.08.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.08.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.09.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.09.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.09.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
02.03.2011 European search report Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.11.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.11.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.08.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.07.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
05.07.2007 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Annex Search / examination 31
18.06.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Annex Search / examination 7
18.06.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.06.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
12.06.2007 Description Search / examination 26
12.06.2007 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
12.06.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
12.06.2007 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
18.01.2001 Priority document Search / examination 32
18.01.2001 Priority document Search / examination 24
18.01.2001 Priority document Search / examination 26