Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1825851


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
27.05.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.06.2016  [2016/26]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
25.09.2015 Change - representative
07.08.2015 Correction of patent specification published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
05.08.2015 Change - representative
17.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
19.06.2015 (Expected) grant published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
12.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.06.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.06.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.01.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.11.2014 Change - classification published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Change - classification published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
22.09.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.07.2014 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.08.2013 New entry: Observations by third parties
04.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.03.2013 Change - representative published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.02.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.12.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.08.2012 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
10.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.08.2012 First examination report published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
30.07.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
04.11.2011 Definitive list of designations published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
21.10.2011 Amendment by applicant
07.10.2011 Request for examination filed published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
01.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2011 Publication of search report published on  30.03.2011  [2011/13]
08.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  10.11.2010  [2010/45]
30.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2007 Change - inventor published on  26.09.2007  [2007/39]
27.07.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.08.2007  [2007/35]
26.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid