blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1868245

EP1868245 - Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2020
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.
80 Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
[2007/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Murayama, Kei
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd.
80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
02 / Higashi, Mitsutoshi
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd.
80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
03 / Koizumi, Naoyuki
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd.
80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
04 / Taguchi, Yuichi
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd.
80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
05 / Shiraishi, Akinori
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd.
80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
06 / Sunohara, Masahiro
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd.
80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
 [2019/37]
Former [2007/51]01 / Murayama, Kei
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd., 80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
02 / Higashi, Mitsutoshi
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd., 80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
03 / Koizumi, Naoyuki
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd., 80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
04 / Taguchi, Yuichi
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd., 80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
05 / Shiraishi, Akinori
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd., 80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
06 / Sunohara, Masahiro
Shinko Electric Industries, Co.,Ltd., 80,Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[2019/37]
Former [2007/51]Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al
Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 330 920
80069 München / DE
Application number, filing date07011906.018.06.2007
[2007/51]
Priority number, dateJP2006016816616.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006168166
[2007/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1868245
Date:19.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1868245
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1868245
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationIPC:H01L25/16, H01L23/14, H01L23/492, H01L23/62, H01L29/866
[2019/14]
CPC:
H01L25/167 (EP,US); H01L23/147 (EP,US); H01L23/4926 (EP,US);
H01L23/62 (EP,US); H01L2224/16145 (EP,US); H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US); H01L2224/48145 (EP,US); H01L2224/4823 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US); H01L24/48 (EP,US); H01L25/16 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US); H01L2924/01078 (EP,US); H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12035 (EP,US); H01L2924/12041 (EP,US); H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US); H01L2924/16235 (EP,US); H01L2924/181 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48145, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12035, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1461, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP)
(-)
Former IPC [2013/15]H01L25/16, H01L23/14, H01L23/492, H01L23/62
Former IPC [2007/51]H01L25/16, H01L23/14, H01L23/492
Designated contracting statesDE [2013/33]
Former [2007/51]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterbauelements[2007/51]
English:Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing semiconductor device[2007/51]
French:Dispositif à semi-conducteurs et procédé de fabrication de dispositif à semi-conducteurs[2007/51]
Examination procedure02.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
11.10.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.11.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.07.2019Fee for grant paid
01.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
01.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2017
Opposition(s)15.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP1030377  (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054]; figures 4,5 * [A] 4,5,10,14 [I] 15;
 [XI]EP1603170  (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,13 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0108]; figures 22-24 * [I] 4,5,9-12,14,15;
 [XAI]WO2006011766  (EPIVALLEY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,12,13 * page 8, line 22 - page 20, line 20; figures 5-12 * [A] 4,5,10,14[I] 7,11,15;
 [X]WO2006054616  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 15, line 25 - page 18, line 4; figures 7-9 *
ExaminationUS6841931
 US2006027826
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.