Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1873327

EP1873327 - Method for laying tiles seamlessly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/01]Tile and method for laying tiles seamlessly
[2008/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rundmund-Dingslaken, Ruth
Bocholder Esch 9
48683 Ahaus-Alstätte / DE
[2008/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/01]
Representative(s)Becker, Thomas , et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/01]Becker, Thomas , et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Kollegen Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date07011924.319.06.2007
[2008/01]
Priority number, dateDE2006102979627.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006029796
[2008/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1873327
Date:02.01.2008
Language:DE
[2008/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1873327
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02
[2008/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verlegung eines fugenlosen Belags[2008/30]
English:Method for laying tiles seamlessly[2008/30]
French:Méthode pour la pose de plaques sans joint[2008/30]
Former [2008/01]Belagsplatte und Verfahren zur Verlegung eines fugenlosen Belags
Former [2008/01]Tile and method for laying tiles seamlessly
Former [2008/01]Plaque de recouvrement et méthode pour la pose de plaques sans joint
Examination procedure11.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/17]
10.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2008Fee for grant paid
19.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
LU19.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
LU19.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
LU19.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/19]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/06]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/28]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/27]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/15]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/07]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/04]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE10233731  (KAINDL SALZBURG M [AT]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * figure 1 * [A] 7;
 [X]EP0123136  (WERTHEBACH GUNTHER) [X] 1-3,6-8 * figure 2 *;
 [XA]AT5922U  (WEITZER PARKETT GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 1-6,10 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure 3 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * [A] 7;
 [X]US2004031227  (KNAUSEDER FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1-7 * figure 1 *;
 [XA]WO02060691  (PERGO AB [SE]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1b,2b * [A] 7;
 [XA]DE10044016  (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * [A] 7