Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1870797

EP1870797 - Textile information carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASTRA Gesellschaft für Asset Management mbH & Co. KG
Steinradweg 3
30890 Barsinghausen / DE
[2007/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Stobbe, Anatoli
Steinradweg 3
30890 Barsinghausen / DE
 [2007/52]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner
Zeppelinstraße 5
30175 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner
Zeppelinstrasse 5
D-30175 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date07012087.820.06.2007
[2007/52]
Priority number, dateDE2006102931223.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006029312
[2007/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1870797
Date:26.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1870797
Date:12.03.2008
[2008/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1870797
Date:27.07.2011
Language:DE
[2011/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/02, G06K19/00, G06K19/077, H04B5/00
[2008/11]
Former International [2007/52]G06F3/02, G06K19/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/47]
Former [2007/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Informationsträger für Textilien[2007/52]
English:Textile information carrier[2007/52]
French:Support d'information sur des textiles[2007/52]
Examination procedure10.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
13.09.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
01.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2011Fee for grant paid
16.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.10.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.02.2012  21.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Datamars SA
Via ai Prati
6930 Bedano / CH
Opponent's representative
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
 [2018/02]
Former [2012/12]
Opponent(s)01  15.02.2012   
Datamars SA
Via ai Prati
6930 Bedano / CH
Opponent's representative
Allwardt, Anke
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte Est.
Austrasse 79
LI-9490 Vaduz / LI
06.06.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.10.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.02.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.03.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.04.2014Appeal received No.  T0986/14
15.07.2014Statement of grounds filed
09.05.2014Appeal received No.  T0986/14
14.07.2014Statement of grounds filed
08.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006028707  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-13,16-23 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] - [0039]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0812752  (TROVAN LTD [US]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * column 11, line 22 - column 13, line 34; figures 5,6 *;
 [Y]US6378774  (EMORI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * figures 2,3a * * column 2, line 44 - line 54 *;
 [Y]EP1528504  (TESSUTI ZAMPAGNA S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4341880  (DINKEL DORIS [DE]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * column 1, line 40 - line 55 * * column 5, line 44 - line 51 *;
 [Y]DE20104647U  (BUNERT PETER [DE]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE19811583  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * column 4, line 15 - line 67 * * figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE19853226  (SIHL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 59 *;
 [Y]EP0977145  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * paragraphs [0136] - [0144]; figure 15 *;
 [Y]DE10341962  (ATOMIC AUSTRIA GMBH ALTENMARKT [AT]) [Y] 1-13,16-23 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO2007028379  (KSW MICROTEC AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-13,16-23 * page 5, line 24; figure -; claims 1,10 *;
 [PX]WO2007012109  (TAGSYS SAS [FR], et al) [PX] 1-13,16-23 * page 3, line 5 - line 9 * * page 9, line 9 * * figures 1,2 *
ExaminationUS2003160732
by applicantWO2006028707
 US2003160732