Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2006772

EP2006772 - Database system and method for external backup [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Andreas
Am Brunnenberg 1
63762 Grossostheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
03 / Obmann, Wolfgang
Julius-Reiber-Strasse 18
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 [2008/52]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date07012270.022.06.2007
[2008/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2006772
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2006772
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14, G06F9/46
[2008/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/52]
TitleGerman:Datenbanksystem und Verfahren zur externen Datensicherung[2008/52]
English:Database system and method for external backup[2008/52]
French:Système de base de données et procédé de sauvegarde externe[2008/52]
Examination procedure22.06.2007Examination requested  [2008/52]
05.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
27.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2010
26.01.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2010Fee for grant paid
16.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
LU22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
ES13.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
HU03.12.2010
[2013/46]
Former [2013/42]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
LU22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
HU03.12.2010
Former [2012/47]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
LU22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
HU03.12.2010
Former [2012/43]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
LU22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
HU03.12.2010
Former [2012/42]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
HU03.12.2010
Former [2012/41]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/35]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
FR02.08.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/22]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
MT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/19]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
RO02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IS02.10.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/06]AT02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
LT02.06.2010
LV02.06.2010
PL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SI02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1361515  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US6957221  (HART DONALD RALPH [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
 [X]  VIRPI MÄKINEN, "Analysis of Use Case Approaches to Requirements Engineering", MASTER'S THESIS, Jyväskylä, (20030619), pages 1 - 144, URL: http://thesis.jyu.fi/v03/G0000231.pdf, (20080207), XP002468204 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 35 - page 40 * * page 48 - page 57, line 10 *
 [X]  C. PAUTASSO ET AL, "Service Oriented Development In a Unified fraMework", DETAILED SPECIFICATION, (20060219), pages 1 - 92, URL: http://www.atc.gr/sodium/upload/publications/D10_Runtime_Platform.pdf, (20080207), XP002468205 [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [03.6] , [03.7] , [4.2.2] , [4.5.4] *