Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2006772 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2006772



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 172
06.04.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.05.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.02.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.02.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
19.02.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.02.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
25.01.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
25.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.01.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.01.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
16.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.11.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.11.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.11.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.11.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
03.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
03.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
03.11.2009 Description Search / examination 3
03.11.2009 Description Search / examination 3
03.11.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
26.10.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Search / examination 2
03.09.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
31.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
31.08.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.08.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
27.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
27.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
23.04.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.04.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
03.12.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.12.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.07.2008 Description Search / examination 2
10.07.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
05.03.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.03.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.02.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.02.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
22.06.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
22.06.2007 Description Search / examination 10
22.06.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.06.2007 Drawings Search / examination 6
22.06.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6