Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2006772


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
13.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
19.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2012  [2012/47]
21.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2012  [2012/43]
14.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2012  [2012/42]
07.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
29.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2011  [2011/35]
29.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2011  [2011/22]
08.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
08.04.2011 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
07.01.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.02.2011  [2011/06]
05.08.2010 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2010 (Expected) grant published on  02.06.2010  [2010/22]
23.04.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.04.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.01.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
10.11.2009 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2009 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
10.11.2009 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2009 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
27.08.2009 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
31.07.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
23.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.05.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.04.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.11.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.11.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
21.11.2008 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
21.11.2008 First examination report
16.07.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.07.2008 Change - representative published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
01.03.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit