EP1958956 - Peptidomimetic protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babine, Robert Edward 7919 Estancia St. Carlsbad, CA 92009-8322 / US | 02 /
Chen, Shu-Hui 3807 Steeplechase Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 03 /
Lamar, Jason Eric 1240 North Broadway, Apt. 19 Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | 04 /
Snyder, Nancy June 3830 West 850 North Lizton, IN 46149 / US | 05 /
Sun, Xicheng David 923 Grays Peak Drive Superior, CO 80027 / US | 06 /
Tebbe, Mark Joseph Volksdorfer Weg 32 22391 Hamburg / DE | 07 /
Victor, Frantz 4855 North Tuxedo Street Indianapolis, IN 46205 / US | 08 /
Wang, Q. May 12345 Moon River Court Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | 09 /
Yip, Yvonne Mai Yee 1441 Bagder Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | 10 /
Collado, Ivan C/Santa Barbara 21, 2c 28220 Madrid / ES | 11 /
Garcia-Paredes, Cristina C/Arroyo de la Elipa 1, 4 Drcha 28017 Madrid / ES | 12 /
Parker, Samuel Raymond, III 361 Union Street Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 13 /
Jin, Ling 3750 Power Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 14 /
Guo, Deqi 5747 Aqua Marine Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 15 /
Glass, John Irvin 625 Bryn Mawr Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
Babine, Robert Edward 7919 Estancia St. Carlsbad, CA 92009-8322 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Shu-Hui 3807 Steeplechase Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
03 /
Lamar, Jason Eric 1240 North Broadway, Apt. 19 Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | |||
04 /
Snyder, Nancy June 3830 West 850 North Lizton, IN 46149 / US | |||
05 /
Sun, Xicheng 923 Grays Peak Drive Superior, CO 80027 / US | |||
06 /
Tebbe, Mark Joseph Volksdorfer Weg 32 22391 Hamburg / DE | |||
07 /
Victor, Frantz 4855 North Tuxedo Street Indianapolis, IN 46205 / US | |||
08 /
Wang, May Q. 12345 Moon River Court Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | |||
09 /
Yip, Mai Yee Yvonne 1441 Bagder Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | |||
10 /
Collado, Ivan C/Santa Barbara 21, 2c 28220 Madrid / ES | |||
11 /
Garcia-Paredes, Cristina C/Arroyo de la Elipa 1, 4 Drcha 28017 Madrid / ES | |||
12 /
Parker, Samuel Raymond, III 361 Union Street Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | |||
13 /
Jin, Ling 3750 Power Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
14 /
Guo, Deqi 5747 Aqua Marine Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
15 /
Glass, John Irvin 625 Bryn Mawr Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | |||
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Babine, Robert Edward 7919 Estancia St. Carlsbad, CA 92009-8322 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Shu-Hui 3807 Steeplechase Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
03 /
Lamar, Jason Eric 1240 North Broadway, Apt. 19 Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | |||
04 /
Snyder, Nancy June 3830 West 850 North Lizton, IN 46149 / US | |||
05 /
Sun, Xicheng 923 Grays Peak Drive Superior, CO 80027 / US | |||
06 /
Tebbe, Mark Joseph Volksdorfer Weg 32 22391 Hamburg / DE | |||
07 /
Victor, Frantz 4855 North Tuxedo Street Indianapolis, IN 46205 / US | |||
08 /
Wang, May Q. 12345 Moon River Court Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | |||
09 /
Yip, Mai Yee Yvonne 1441 Bagder Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | |||
10 /
Collado, Ivan C/Santa Barbara 21, 2c 28220 Madrid / ES | |||
11 /
Garcia-Paredes, Cristina C/Arroyo de la Elipa 1, 4 Drcha 28017 Madrid / ES | |||
12 /
Parker, Samuel Raymond, III 361 Union Street Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | |||
13 /
Jin, Ling 3750 Power Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
14 /
Duo, Deqi 5747 Aqua Marine Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
15 /
Glass, John Irvin 625 Bryn Mawr Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | |||
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Babine, Robert Edward 19 Concetta Way Franklin, MA 02038 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Shu-Hui 3807 Steeplechase Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
03 /
Lamar, Jason Eric 1240 North Broadway, Apt. 19 Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | |||
04 /
Snyder, Nancy June 3830 West 850 North Lizton, IN 46149 / US | |||
05 /
Sun, Xicheng 923 Grays Peak Drive Superior, CO 80027 / US | |||
06 /
Tebbe, Mark Joseph Volksdorfer Weg 32 22391 Hamburg / DE | |||
07 /
Victor, Frantz 4855 North Tuxedo Street Indianapolis, IN 46205 / US | |||
08 /
Wang, May Q. 12345 Moon River Court Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | |||
09 /
Yip, Mai Yee Yvonne 1441 Bagder Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | |||
10 /
Collado, Ivan C/Santa Barbara 21, 2c 28220 Madrid / ES | |||
11 /
Garcia-Paredes, Cristina C/Arroyo de la Elipa 1, 4 Drcha 28017 Madrid / ES | |||
12 /
Parker, Samuel Raymond, III 511 Hayfield Court Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | |||
13 /
Jin, Ling 3750 Power Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
14 /
Duo, Deqi 5747 Aqua Marine Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
15 /
Glass, John Irvin 625 Bryn Mawr Drive Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07012483.9 | 31.08.2001 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | US20000229398P | 31.08.2000 Original published format: US 229398 P | US20010277641P | 21.03.2001 Original published format: US 277641 P | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1958956 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1958956 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958956 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/08, A61P31/12 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (KR);
A61K38/07 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP,US);
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61K38/215 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D209/02 (EP,US);
C07D209/52 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K5/0202 (EP,US);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US);
C07K5/06052 (EP,US);
C07K5/0808 (EP,US);
C07K5/101 (EP,US);
C07K5/1016 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/095 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/21, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | 19.07.2007 | LT | 19.07.2007 | LV | 19.07.2007 | MK | 19.07.2007 | RO | 19.07.2007 | SI | 19.07.2007 | Title | German: | Inhibitoren der peptidomimetischen Protease | [2008/34] | English: | Peptidomimetic protease inhibitors | [2008/34] | French: | Inhibiteurs de prothèse peptidominétique | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01968040.4 / EP1320540 | Divisional application(s) | EP10185722.5 / EP2371839 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010968040) is 08.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2009 | Decision despatched | The application was refused due to failure to file the sequence listing | 06.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 06.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.03.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | LU | 31.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
SE | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09124691 ; | [Y]US4880780 (TRAINOR DIANE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-125 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5371072 (WEBB THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-125 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5656600 (ABELMAN MATTHEW M [US], et al) [Y] 1-125 * claim 1 *; | [DX]WO9817679 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [DX] 1-125 * claim 1 *; | [DX]WO9907733 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [DX] 1-125 * claim 1 *; | [DX]WO9907734 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [DX] 1-125* claim 1 *; | [A]WO0009543 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-125 * claim 1 *; | [DX]WO0009558 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [DX] 1-125 * claim 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09124691 A 19970513 (GREEN CROSS CORP:THE) [Y] 1-125 * abstract * | by applicant | - A. ALBERTI ET AL., "Natural History of Hepatitis C", J. HEPATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 17 - 24 | - M.J. ALTER, "Hepatitis C Virus Infection in the United States", J. HEPATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 88 - 91 | - D. LAVANCHY, "Global Surveillance and Control of Hepatitis C", J. VIRAL HEPATITIS, (1999), vol. 6, pages 35 - 47 | - Q.-L. CHOO ET AL., "Genetic Organization and Diversity of the Hepatitis C Virus", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 2451 - 2455 | - LIPINSKI, "Annual Reports in Medicinal Chemistry", BIOISOSTERISM IN DRUG DESIGN, (1986), vol. 21, page 283 | - YUN; HWAHAK SEKYE, APPLICATION OF BIOISOSTERISM TO NEW DRUG DESIGN, (1993), vol. 33, pages 576 - 579 | - ZHAO, "Huaxue Tongbao", BIOISOSTERIC REPLACEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF LEAD COMPOUNDS IN DRUG DESIGN, (1995), pages 34 - 38 | - GRAHAM, "Theochem", THEORETICAL STUDIES APPLIED TO DRUG DESIGN:AB INITIO ELECTRONIC DISTRIBUTIONS IN BIOISOSTERES, (1995), vol. 343, pages 105 - 109 | - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, vol. 10, page 33 | - GIBSON, F.G.; BERMEIER, S.C.; RAPOPORT, H., J. ORG CHEM., (1994), vol. 59, pages 3216 - 3218 | - The organic Chemistry of ?-Lactams, VCH PUBLISHERS, INC., (1993), pages 240 - 241,303- | - TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, pages 6785 - 6796 | - BLIGHT ET AL., "Efficient Initiation of HCV RNA Replication in Cell Culture", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 1972 - 1974 | - CHUNG ET AL., "Hepatitis C virus replication is directly inhibited by IFN-? in a full-length binary expression system", PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2001), vol. 98, no. 17, pages 9847 - 52 | - CHUTAPUTTI A., "Adverse effects and other safety aspects of the hepatitis C antivirals", JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY AND HEPATOLOGY, (2000), pages E156 - 63 | - SHIFFMAN M. L.; VERBEKE S. B.; KIMBALL P. M., "Alpha interferon combined with ribavirin potentiates proliferative suppression but not cytokine production in mitogenically stimulated human lymphocytes", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH., (2000), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 91 - 9 | - ROEHM N.W.; RODGERS G. H.; HATFIELD S. M.; GLASEBROOK A. L., "An improved colorimetric assay for cell proliferation and viability utilizing the tetrazolium salt XTT", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1991), vol. 142, no. 2, pages 257 - 65 | - BRINK N.; SZAMEL M.; YOUNG A.R.; WITTEM K.P.; BERGEMANN J., "Comparative quantification of IL-lbeta, IL-10, IL-10r, TNFalpha and IL-7 mRNA levels in UV-irradiated human skin in vivo", INFLAMATION RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 49, no. 6, pages 290 - 6 |