Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1876616

EP1876616 - Reset device for limit switch and limit switch incorporating such device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.08.2012  [2012/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pizzato Elettrica S.r.l.
Via Torino 1
36063 Marostica (Vicenza) / IT
[2008/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Pizzato, Marco
Via 4 Martiri 7
36063 Marostica (Vicenza) / IT
 [2008/02]
Representative(s)Maroscia, Antonio , et al
Maroscia & Associati Srl
Piazza del Castello, 26
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2010/42]Maroscia, Antonio , et al
Maroscia & Associati Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2009/35]Pajola, Stefano , et al
Maroscia & Associati S.r.l Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2009/13]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph , et al
Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2008/50]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph , et al
Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contrà S. Caterina, 29
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2008/46]Pajola, Stefano , et al
Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà S. Caterina, 29
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2008/02]Vannini, Mario
Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contrà S. Caterina, 29
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date07012965.503.07.2007
[2008/02]
Priority number, dateIT2006VI0021107.07.2006         Original published format: IT VI20060211
[2008/02]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1876616
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1876616
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1876616
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01H11/00, H01H13/68, H01H21/28, // H01H3/20
[2009/09]
Former International [2008/02]H01H3/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/44]
Former [2008/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rücksetzungsvorrichtung für einen Begrenzungsschalter und Begrenzungsschalter mit einer solchen Vorrichtung[2008/02]
English:Reset device for limit switch and limit switch incorporating such device[2008/02]
French:Dispositif de réinitialisation et interrupteur de fin de course incorporant un tel dispositif[2008/02]
Examination procedure29.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
26.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2011Fee for grant paid
09.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.09.2009
Opposition(s)15.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08111141  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-4,6,9-17 * abstract *;
 [DA]US6627827  (KIONG LOW KOK [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19503156  (REITER SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3043240  (KLOECKNER MOELLER ELEKTRIZIT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, paragraph 2; figures 3,4 *
by applicantJPH08111141