EP2022522 - Devices and methods for the injection of agents into human and animal tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W & H Dentalwerk Bürmoos GmbH Ignaz-Glaser-Strasse 53 5111 Bürmoos / AT | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teufelberger, Gunther Grundlose Strasse 11 5111 Bürmoos / AT | 02 /
Wagner, Hannes Weiher Wiesbach Stasse 7 5023 Salzburg / AT | 03 /
Oberascher, Christine Eisping 15 5151 Nussdorf / DE | 04 /
Kapeller, Stefan Kroisbach 13 5151 Nussdorf / DE | 05 /
Sigl, Rainer Weyer 59 5120 Haigermoos / AT | 06 /
Hörmann, Udo Nussdorfer Strasse 14 5411 Oberalm / DE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 07014560.2 | 25.07.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022522 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022522 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61M5/2466 (EP,US);
A61M5/31581 (EP,US);
A61M5/3213 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3215 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3289 (EP,US);
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Injektion von Medien in menschliche und tierische Gewebe | [2009/07] | English: | Devices and methods for the injection of agents into human and animal tissue | [2009/07] | French: | Dispositif et procédé destinés à l'injection de milieux dans des tissus humains et animaux | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 11.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2007 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | IT | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | LU | 25.07.2012 | AT | 31.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
LU | 25.07.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2773500 (YOUNG HAROLD S) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * figures 1-8 * * column 2, line 34 - column 5, line 18 *; | [X]US3811442 (MAROTH A) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 54 *; | [A]FR2581548 (VILLETTE ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * * page 4, line 31 - page 9, line 14 *; | [XA]WO9630065 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-16,18,24-28 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 18 - page 6, line 5 * [A] 17; | [X]WO9639213 (SENETEK PLC [US]) [X] 11-15,18 * figures 1-13 * * page 10, line 26 - page 18, line 22 *; | [X]WO0009186 (MEDI JECT CORP [US], et al) [X] 11-16,18,24-28 * figures 1-27 * * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 29 *; | [X]WO0067822 (MILESTONE SCIENTIFIC INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-12 * * page 8, line 11 - page 17, line 25 *; | [X]WO0132241 (SPECIALIZED HEALTH PROD INC [US]) [X] 29,31 * figures 1-8 ** page 8, line 3 - page 9, line 7 *; | [X]DE10254442 (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH]) [X] 11-14,17,24-31 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] *; | [X]WO2007018809 (VIDACARE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1-8 * * page 8, line 14 - page 38, line 25 * | by applicant | US4787893 |