Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1883190 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1079
18.09.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
11.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 51
05.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.02.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 7
12.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 6
09.01.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
09.01.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
09.01.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
09.01.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.09.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
02.09.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
30.08.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
16.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
02.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
28.07.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.07.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
05.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
29.07.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.07.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.07.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
10.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
10.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
10.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
08.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
08.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
08.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
08.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
08.12.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 30
04.08.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
31.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
24.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Request for registration of a postal address for the applicant Appeal 2
24.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
16.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.05.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
14.03.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
14.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.01.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
22.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
20.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.12.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.11.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.11.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.10.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Designation of inventor Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
22.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Opposition 6
21.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
10.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
30.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.09.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
23.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2013 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
27.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.05.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
27.05.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.05.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
08.04.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 1
08.04.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
13.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
30.04.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
06.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.02.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
15.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
15.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
15.09.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.10.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
26.10.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.08.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.08.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
19.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.06.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.06.2008 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.06.2008 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.06.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
03.06.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.02.2008 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.01.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 5
20.09.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
07.08.2007 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.07.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
27.07.2007 Description Search / examination 9
27.07.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.07.2007 Drawings Search / examination 3
27.07.2007 Priority document Search / examination 10
27.07.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6