Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020594

EP2020594 - Method of and apparatus for determining geometrical dimensions of a vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snap-on Equipment Srl a unico socio
Via Provinciale per Carpi, 33
42015 Correggio (RE) / IT
[2014/19]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Snap-on Equipment Srl a unico socio.
Via Provinciale per Carpi, 33
42015 Correggio (Reggio Emilia) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Braghiroli, Francesco
Via Caravaggio 4
42122 Reggio Emilia / IT
 [2013/41]
Former [2009/06]01 / Braghiroli, Francesco
Via Caravaggio 4
42100 Reggio Emilia / IT
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[2014/19]
Former [2009/06]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date07014949.730.07.2007
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020594
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020594
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:B60C25/138, G01M17/02, B60C25/05
[2013/24]
Former International [2013/20]B60C25/05
Former International [2009/06]G01M17/02, B60C25/138
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestimmen der geometrischen Abmessungen eines Fahrzeugrades[2009/06]
English:Method of and apparatus for determining geometrical dimensions of a vehicle wheel[2009/06]
French:Procédé et appareil pour déterminer les dimensions géométriques d'une roue de véhicule[2009/06]
Examination procedure29.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/12]
05.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2014Fee for grant paid
25.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2009
Opposition(s)10.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2007
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2016/25]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2016/21]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/13]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
LU30.07.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XDY]US5054918  (DOWNING ELIZABETH A [US], et al) [XD] 1-11,15,16,18-22,25,27-30,32 * column 3 - column 9; figure -; claim - * [Y] 12-14,31;
 [Y]EP1584495  (BUTLER ENG & MARKETING [IT]) [Y] 12-14,31 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2004165180  (VOELLER DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 12-14,31 * paragraphs [0081] , [0082]; figure 17; claim - *;
 [A]EP1515129  (SNAP ON EQUIP SRL UNICO SOCIO [IT]) [A] 1-5,7-9,15-21,25-30,32 * column 2 - column 4; figure -; claim - *
by applicantUS5054918
 US2004165180
 EP1515129