Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022619

EP2022619 - Device and method for welding sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2013  [2013/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
4JET Sales + Service GmbH
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
52477 Alsdorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/48]For all designated states
4 Jet Sales & Service GmbH
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
52477 Alsdorf / DE
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
ProLas GmbH
St. Jobser-Strasse 53
52146 Würselen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Deschler, Marc, Dr.
Schlottenfelder Winkel 21
52074 Aachen / DE
02 / Hänsch, Dirk, Dr.
Waldring 18
4730 Hauset / BE
03 / Ott, Peter
Batterieweg 183
53424 Remagen / DE
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/01]
Former [2009/07]Paul, Dieter-Alfred , et al
Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18
41460 Neuss / DE
Application number, filing date07015181.602.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022619
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/00, // B29C65/16
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verschweissen von Bahnen[2009/07]
English:Device and method for welding sheets[2009/07]
French:Dispositif et procédé destinés au soudage de bandes[2009/07]
Examination procedure23.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
30.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/10]
15.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2010
31.08.201004   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.2010
31.08.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202006014872U  (PROLAS PRODUKTIONSLASER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,12,25,27,29 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] - [0030] *;
 [X]US3384526  (ABRAMSON ANDREW E, et al) [X] 1-8,11,12,25,27,29 * figures 1,2 * * columns 4,5 *;
 [X]EP1479507  (LEISTER PROCESS TECH [CH]) [X] 1-8,11,12,25,27,29 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * * figure 1 *;
 [X]DD84474  (DIPL.-ING. HANS-EBERHARD STEINICKE) [X] 1-8,11,12,25,27,29 * figure 1 * * Seite 3 unten bis Seite 4 Mitte *;
 [XA]EP0200329  (HALL ALETHEA ROSALIND MELANIE) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,12,25,27,29 * pages 3-4 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4