Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020561

EP2020561 - Luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Engel, Hartmut S.
Monrepos Strasse 7
71634 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date07015211.102.08.2007
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020561
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020561
Date:14.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:F21S6/00, F21V14/02, // F21Y101/02
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Leuchte[2009/06]
English:Luminaire[2009/06]
French:Luminaire[2009/06]
Examination procedure09.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
19.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2009Fee for grant paid
28.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
TR14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
HU15.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
HU15.04.2010
Former [2012/37]CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2012/05]CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2011/06]CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
GR15.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/42]CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
BG14.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/27]FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE202006017356U  (LIAO YUNG CHIANG [TW]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11,14-18 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0017] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 10;
 [X]DE29919055U  (WILA LEUCHTEN AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,9,15,16 * page 4, line 11 - line 26 * * page 5, line 3 - line 26 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE8615418U  (FISCHOETTER, FLORIAN, 2000 HAMBURG, DE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8712144U  (TOLK, WOLFGANG, 5000 KOELN, DE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10242938  (ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE20107451U  (KNAPP MICHAEL G [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *