Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022367

EP2022367 - Make-up brush and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kim, Tae Jin
Wesbox 91101 45 Wyllys Avenue
Middletown, CT 06459-1101 / US
[2009/42]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
CPI Korea Inc.
4F. Woojin Bldg.,880-8 Bangbae-dong Seocho-gu
Seoul, 137-060 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Tae Jin
281-3, Gwangtan-ri
Yongmun-myeon
Yangpyeong-gun
Gyeonggi-do, 476-841 / KR
 [2012/26]
Former [2009/07]01 / Kim, Tae Jin
281-3, Gwangtan-ri Yongmun-myeon Yangpyeong-gun
Gyeonggi-do, 476-841 / KR
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/26]LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2009/07]LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date07015682.309.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022367
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022367
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A46B3/10, A46B9/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Kosmetikpinsel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2009/07]
English:Make-up brush and method of manufacturing the same[2009/07]
French:Brosse de maquillage et son procédé de fabrication[2009/07]
Examination procedure09.08.2007Examination requested  [2009/07]
08.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2012Fee for grant paid
10.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2009
Opposition(s)28.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.08.2007
AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
MT27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
TR27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
LU09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG27.09.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
DE01.03.2013
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
MT27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
TR27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
LU09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG27.09.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
DE01.03.2013
Former [2014/21]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
MT27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
TR27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG27.09.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
DE01.03.2013
Former [2013/51]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
MT27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG27.09.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
DE01.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG27.09.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
DE01.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG27.09.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/33]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
IE09.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/22]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/21]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/20]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/16]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
MC31.08.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/15]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
NL27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
IT27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
PL27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
CY27.06.2012
CZ27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
RO27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
SK27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
IS27.10.2012
Former [2013/09]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
EE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT27.06.2012
BE27.06.2012
FI27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
Former [2012/51]FI27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
SI27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
Former [2012/50]FI27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
LV27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI27.06.2012
LT27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
Former [2012/47]LT27.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3712962  (SCHLERF CORONET WERKE [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-11 * column 5, line 13 - line 32 * * column 6, line 23 - line 25 * * figures 1-3,5,7,8 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]EP0694266  (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 4 * figures 7-14 *
by applicantDE3712962