Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023549

EP2023549 - Method and device for bandwidth sharing and communication system comprising such device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2010  [2010/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Martinez dos Santos Gomes, Teresa
Rua Carlos Seixas, 157, 6 Esq
3030-177 Coimbra / PT
02 / De Frias Rebelo Nunes, Pedro Ricardo
Rua Antero de Figueredo, 7-5[deg]A
2795016 Linda-A-Velha / PT
 [2009/16]
Former [2009/07]01 / Martinez dos Santos Gomez, Teresa
Rua Carlos Seixas, 157, 6 Esq
3030-177 Coimbra / PT
02 / De Frias Rebelo Nunes, Pedro Ricardo
Rua Antero de Figueredo, 7-5[deg]A
2795016 Linda-A-Velha / PT
Representative(s)Bruglachner, Thomas E.
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
Patentabteilung
Postfach 80 17 60
81617 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Bruglachner, Thomas E.
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60
81617 München / DE
Application number, filing date07015720.109.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023549
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zum Aufteilen von Bandbreite und Kommunikationssystem welches ein solches Gerät enthält[2009/07]
English:Method and device for bandwidth sharing and communication system comprising such device[2009/07]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour partager la largeur de bande et système contenant le dispositif pareil[2009/07]
Examination procedure11.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
03.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/35]
16.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004193724  (DZIONG ZBIGNIEW M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2005286411  (ALICHERRY MANSOOR A K [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] *;
 [A]US2006268682  (VASSEUR JEAN-PHILIPPE [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0060] , [0065] *;
 [A]US2006153067  (VASSEUR JEAN-PHILLIPE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0062] *