blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1886573

EP1886573 - Clipping machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2018Opposition rejectedpublished on 27.06.2018  [2018/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG
Niedeckerstraße 1
65795 Hattersheim / DE
[2012/41]
Former [2008/07]For all designated states
Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG
Westerbachstrasse 45
60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ebert, Detlef
Frankfurter Strasse 45
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
02 / Hummel, Michael
Liebfrauen Strasse 5a
65479 Raunheim / DE
 [2008/07]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Former [2008/07]Fritsche, Rainer
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date07015727.609.08.2007
[2008/07]
Priority number, dateDE20062012324U10.08.2006         Original published format: DE 202006012324 U
[2008/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1886573
Date:13.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1886573
Date:21.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2007
ClassificationIPC:A22C11/12
[2008/07]
CPC:
A22C11/125 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   IT,   LI,   PL [2008/43]
Former [2008/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Clipmaschine[2008/07]
English:Clipping machine[2008/07]
French:Machine de fermeture par clip[2008/07]
Examination procedure10.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/34]
07.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.09.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2009Fee for grant paid
10.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.03.2010  25.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Tipper Tie Alpina GmbH
Waldau 1
9230 Flawil / CH
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2010  25.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Tipper Tie Alpina GmbH
Waldau 1
9230 Flawil / CH
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2010  25.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Tipper Tie Alpina GmbH
Waldau 1
9230 Flawil / CH
Opponent's representative
Russlies, Stephan, et al, et al
Glawe-Delfs-Moll Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 13 03 91
D-20103 Hamburg / DE
Former [2010/17]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2010  25.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Tipper Tie Alpina AG
Ringstrasse 14
9201 Gossau / CH
Opponent's representative
Russlies, Stephan, et al, et al
Glawe-Delfs-Moll Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 13 03 91
D-20103 Hamburg / DE
27.08.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
06.06.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.06.2013Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
13.05.2018Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/26]
Appeal following opposition25.06.2013Appeal received No.  T1468/13
26.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
26.04.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2012/03]
Former [2011/33]IT09.08.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10131807  (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0031] , [0041] - [0043] - [0047] - [0050] - [0053]; figures 1a,2a,8a; claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0900733  (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] , [0020]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3377692  (TIPPER MAYNARD J G) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, lines 16-48; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2005274088  (GRIGGS SAMUEL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] - [0073] , [0075]; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP1095570  (TIPPER TIE ALPINA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0302966  (TEE PAK INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.