Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023565

EP2023565 - Method and device for data interception and communication system comprising such device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Kröselberg, Dirk
Pestalozzistrasse 27
80469 München / DE
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Schober, Ralf Stefan
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
Patentabteilung
Postfach 80 17 60
81617 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Schober, Ralf Stefan
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60
81617 München / DE
Application number, filing date07015780.510.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023565
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2009/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abfangen von Daten und Kommunikationssystem mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung[2009/07]
English:Method and device for data interception and communication system comprising such device[2009/07]
French:Procédé et dispositif de traitement de données et système de communication comprenant un tel dispositif[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005069663  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 1, lines 9-13 * * page 3, line 20 - line 25 * * page 6, line 27 - page 9, line 34 * * page 14, line 7 - page 16, line 2 *;
 [X]WO2006111357  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 7, line 32 *