Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022452

EP2022452 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]Absorbent core
[2012/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2013/10]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Carlucci, Giovanni
Via Fieramosca, 118
66100 Chieti / IT
02 / Tamburro, Maurizio
Via Colombo 10
66020 S. Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
03 / Gagliardini, Alessandro
Localita' Piana Piccola, 1
64100 Villa Vomano (Teramo) / IT
04 / Toro, Evelina
Via Fratelli Pomilio, 109
66100 Chieti / IT
05 / Veronese Pancrazio
Viale J.F Kennedy, 116
65123 Pescara / IT
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2011/43]Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128-130
66020 Sambuceto di S. Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2009/40]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130
66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
Former [2009/07]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A., Via Aterno 128-130
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino / IT
Application number, filing date07015805.010.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022452
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022452
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Saugfähiger Artikel[2012/42]
English:Absorbent article[2012/42]
French:Article absorbant[2012/42]
Former [2009/07]Saugfähiger Kern
Former [2009/07]Absorbent core
Former [2009/07]Noyau absorbant
Examination procedure20.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
26.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2013Fee for grant paid
25.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2009
Opposition(s)09.12.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.06.2010Request for further processing filed
16.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.06.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.08.2007
AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
IE10.08.2013
LU10.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
IE10.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
IE10.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/47]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/38]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT06.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6790798  (SUZUKI MIGAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 10 - line 12 * * column 2, line 18 - line 19 * * column 3, line 5 * * column 6, line 57 - line 60 * * figures 4,17 * [Y] 1-12;
 [Y]EP1447067  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 2, line 35 - line 56 * * column 8, line 33 - line 36 * * column 9, line 10 - line 20 * * figure 6 * * claims 3,4,6 *;
 [X]EP0826349  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * column 2, line 55 - line 58 * * column 4, line 27 - line 40 * * column 6, line 50 - line 51 * * column 7, line 19 - line 26 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US2006206073  (CRANE PATRICK L [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, paragraphs 1,7 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * figure 8 *;
 [Y]EP0875224  (CIDIEFFE S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 35 - line 37 * * column 4, line 55 - line 57 * * column 5, line 10 - line 25 * * column 6, line 52 - line 55 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9619173  (TREDEGAR IND INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * page 5, line 29 - line 30 * * page 6, line 29 * * page 8, line 26 - line 30 * * page 9, line 11 - line 13 * * figures 1,5,6 *
by applicantEP0724418
 EP1447067
 US3929135
 US4151240
 US4319868
 US4324426
 US4343314
 US4591523
 US4609518
 US4629643
 US4695422
 WO9600548
 EP0752892
 WO2007047598
 US6417424