EP2025232 - Method for manufacturing batter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states frischli Milchwerke GmbH Bahndamm 4 31547 Rehburg-Loccum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Frischli Milchwerke GmbH Bahndamm 4 31543 Rehburg-Loccum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtorf, Hans Schwiecheldstrasse 2 31535 Neustadt Rbg. / DE | 02 /
Schäkel, Lars Rühmkorffstrasse 5a 31582 Nienburg / DE | 03 /
Winkelmann, Timo Dr. Am Jahnplatz 17 31515 Wunstorf / DE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Patentanwälte Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016061.9 | 16.08.2007 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025232 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A21D6/00, A21D10/04, A23L3/16, A21D13/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A21D10/045 (EP);
A21D13/45 (EP);
A21D6/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines fliessfähigen Teiges | [2009/08] | English: | Method for manufacturing batter | [2009/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de pâte fluide | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0324291 (CONFISERIE CHOCOLATERIE PATIN [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 4, lines 10-31 * * column 5, lines 17-56 * * column 6, lines 22-28 * * column 7, lines 1-11 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 26 * * column 9, lines 47-53 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 8 * * claims 1-22 *; | [XY]EP0443219 (JOYVALLE C V [BE]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, lines 49-54 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 9 * * example 1 * * claims 1,6,7,9 * [Y] 5-7; | [X]US3970763 (MORAN DAVID PATRICK JOSEPH, et al) [X] 1,2,8 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 23-44 * * column 3, lines 10-42 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-4,14,15 *; | [X]US3159495 (JAPIKSE CORNELIS H) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 30-36 * * example 1 *; | [Y]FR2609601 (VALMONT SA [FR]) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2636507 (AGRO INVESTISSEMENT DEV [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2965500 (SANGER WERNER J) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0237970 (CEBA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2870026 (KELLER HAROLD M, et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004067294 (PEDRICK EDWARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0820704 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 5-7 * the whole document * |