Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028906

EP2028906 - Signalling and mapping of measurement reports [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2012
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Feuersänger, Martin
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
02 / Löhr, Joachim
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
03 / Golitschek Edler von Elbwart, Alexander
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/52]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07016131.016.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028906
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028906
Date:28.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Signalisierung und Abbildung von Messberichten[2009/09]
English:Signalling and mapping of measurement reports[2009/09]
French:Signalisations et cartographie de rapports de mesures[2009/09]
Examination procedure06.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
02.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2011Fee for grant paid
15.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11180942.2  / EP2398272
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2009
Opposition(s)01.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.08.2007
AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
FI28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
MT28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
TR28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
IE16.08.2012
LU16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
FI28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
MT28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
TR28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
IE16.08.2012
LU16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2014/21]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
FI28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
MT28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
TR28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/51]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
FI28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
MT28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
FI28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/29]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
FI28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
ES08.04.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/20]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT28.12.2011
BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
Former [2012/50]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
IT28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
Former [2012/49]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
DK28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
Former [2012/37]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
PL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
PT30.04.2012
Former [2012/36]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
RO28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
SK28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
Former [2012/35]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
EE28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
NL28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
BG28.03.2012
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
Former [2012/34]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
CZ28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
GR29.03.2012
IS28.04.2012
Former [2012/30]BE28.12.2011
CY28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
GR29.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY28.12.2011
LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
GR29.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT28.12.2011
LV28.12.2011
SE28.12.2011
SI28.12.2011
GR29.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT28.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007149132  (LI JUNYL [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]US2007168326  (DAS ARNAB [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] *;
 [A]WO2007050729  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] *
 [X]  ETSI, 3GPP TS 25.331, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS, FRANCE, ETSI, XP014036346 [X] 1 * paragraph [8.4.0] - paragraph [8.4.1.2] *