blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2025278

EP2025278 - Vacuum cleaner filter bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.06.2018
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eurofilters Holding N.V.
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Sauer, Ralf
Eurofilters Holding N.V. Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
02 / Schultink, Jan
Eurofilters Holding N.V. Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07016207.817.08.2007
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025278
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025278
Date:13.05.2009
Language:DE
[2009/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationIPC:A47L9/14
[2009/08]
CPC:
A47L9/1454 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Staubsaugerfilterbeutel[2009/08]
English:Vacuum cleaner filter bag[2009/08]
French:Sac d'aspirateur[2009/08]
Examination procedure11.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
11.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2009Fee for grant paid
11.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2010  23.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Wolf PVG GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 15
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
Opponent's representative
Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 02  15.02.2010  02.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Branofilter GmbH
Industriestr. 23
D-90599 Dietenhofen / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/13]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2010  23.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Wolf PVG GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 15
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
Opponent's representative
Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck Stracke Specht Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
D-33602 Bielefeld / DE
 02  15.02.2010   
Branofilter GmbH
Industriestr. 23
D-90599 Dietenhofen / DE
Opponent's representative
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2010/11]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2010    ADMISSIBLE
Wolf PVG GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 15
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
Opponent's representative
Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck Stracke Specht Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
D-33602 Bielefeld / DE
19.03.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.09.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2012Date of oral proceedings
15.10.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.10.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.10.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/29]
30.11.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.12.2012Appeal received No.  T0058/13
22.02.2013Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
20.12.2012Appeal received No.  T0058/13
21.02.2013Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
21.12.2012Appeal received No.  T0058/13
20.02.2013Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
20.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.05.2009
CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
MT13.05.2009
RO13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
TR13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
GR14.08.2009
AT17.08.2009
LU17.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
HU14.11.2009
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
[2015/22]
Former [2012/03]CY13.05.2009
CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
MT13.05.2009
RO13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
TR13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
GR14.08.2009
AT17.08.2009
LU17.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
HU14.11.2009
Former [2011/33]CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
MT13.05.2009
RO13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
GR14.08.2009
AT17.08.2009
LU17.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
HU14.11.2009
IT17.08.2010
Former [2011/22]CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
MT13.05.2009
RO13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
GR14.08.2009
AT17.08.2009
LU17.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Former [2011/19]CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
RO13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
GR14.08.2009
AT17.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Former [2011/06]CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
GR14.08.2009
AT17.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Former [2010/17]CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
BG13.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Former [2010/15]CZ13.05.2009
EE13.05.2009
FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
SK13.05.2009
MC31.08.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Former [2010/07]FI13.05.2009
IE13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Former [2010/05]FI13.05.2009
LT13.05.2009
LV13.05.2009
SI13.05.2009
IS13.09.2009
PT13.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]DE9016893U  (GEBRUEDER VOIT, 8500 NUERNBERG, DE) [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 6, lines 1-4 ** figures 2,3 *;
 [AY]WO03073903  (FATEHPOUR EDISON [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 4-7 * * page 2, lines 23-28 * * page 3, lines 13-20 * * claim 5 * * figure 1 * [Y] 10,11;
 [XY]DE202006019108U  (BRANOFILTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] , [0027] , [0028] , [0033] , [0034] , [0043] * * figures 1,5 * [Y] 10,11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.