Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028886

EP2028886 - Methods and devices which enable to determine if a handover of a communication in which a mobile terminal is involved has to be executed from a first base station to a second base station [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V.
Capronilaan 46
1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL
For all designated states
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V.
Capronilaan 46
1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL
For all designated states
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Voyer, Nicolas
c/o Mitsubishi Electric ITE 1, allèe de Beaulieu CS 10806
35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
02 / Bonneville, Hervé
c/o Mitsubishi Electric ITE 1, allèe de Beaulieu CS 10806
35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet
5, place Newquay
B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/31]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250
25802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Former [2009/09]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet LE GUEN MAILLET 5, place Newquay BP 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07016297.920.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028886
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028886
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Ermöglichung der Bestimmung, ob die Weiterreichung einer Kommunikation, in der ein mobiles Endgerät beteiligt ist, von der ersten Basisstation zur zweiten Basisstation ausgeführt werden muss[2009/09]
English:Methods and devices which enable to determine if a handover of a communication in which a mobile terminal is involved has to be executed from a first base station to a second base station[2009/09]
French:Procédés et dispositifs qui permettent de déterminer si un transfert de communication dans lequel est impliqué un terminal mobile doit être exécuté depuis une première station de base vers une deuxième station de base[2009/09]
Examination procedure10.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/17]
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2010Fee for grant paid
17.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IT04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
TR04.08.2010
IE20.08.2010
LU20.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
ES15.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
HU05.02.2011
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IT04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
IE20.08.2010
LU20.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
ES15.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
HU05.02.2011
Former [2012/42]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IT04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
IE20.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
ES15.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
HU05.02.2011
Former [2012/05]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IT04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
IE20.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
ES15.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
Former [2011/33]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IT04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
IE20.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
ES15.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
Former [2011/29]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IT04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
ES15.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
Former [2011/23]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
Former [2011/19]AT04.08.2010
BE04.08.2010
CY04.08.2010
DK04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
SE04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
PT06.12.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US5887256  (LU PRISCILLA MARILYN [US], et al) [A] 1,8,12,13 * column 13, line 59 - column 14, line 42 *
by applicantUS5997256