Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028797

EP2028797 - Data transmission method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2010
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2011Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 18.01.2012  [2012/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klotz, Dieter, Dr.
Kannenbergstrasse 15
90768 Fürth / DE
02 / Tretter, Albert
Magdeburger Strasse 21
92712 Pirk / DE
 [2009/09]
Application number, filing date07016558.423.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028797
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028797
Date:24.02.2010
Language:DE
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/40
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Datenübertragung[2009/09]
English:Data transmission method[2009/09]
French:Procédé de transmission de données[2009/09]
Examination procedure06.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
26.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.01.2010Fee for grant paid
04.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2012/03]
Former [2011/33]IT23.08.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1748338  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]WO2005034439  (BERNECKER & RAINER IND ELEKTRO [AT], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 * * page 5 - page 6 *;
 [DA]DE19922497  (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-19 * column 1, line 12 - line 50 * * column 3, line 47 - line 56 *