Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028067

EP2028067 - Vehicle anti-theft SOS-calling device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yu, Pin-Ying
No.35, Lane 249, Section 4 Jun-An Road
Tainan City / TW
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Volpert, Marcus , et al
Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Herrnstrasse 4
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Volpert, Marcus , et al
Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Postfach 26 02 51
D-80059 München / DE
Application number, filing date07016661.624.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028067
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/10, B60Q1/26, H01Q1/06, G08B13/14
[2009/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Diebstahlschutz-SOS-Rufsystem für ein Fahrzeug[2009/09]
English:Vehicle anti-theft SOS-calling device[2009/09]
French:Dispositif d'appel d'urgence antivol pour véhicule[2009/09]
Examination procedure26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/09]
01.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/09]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2328053  (DAVIES SIMON GEOFFREY [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4,6;
 [XY]GB2300744  (META SYSTEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 4; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,6;
 [A]GB2276747  (STEPHENS TIMOTHY NALDER [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2341472  (PHILLIPS ALAN JAMES [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *;
 [AY]WO0041913  (ALEXANDER JERRY D [US]) [A] 1 * pages 6,7; figures 3,6,7,10,11,13 * [Y] 3;
 [A]US2007139170  (HIGUCHI HIROFUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0069]; figures 6A-6C *;
 [AY]US4868542  (THOMPSON MICHAEL L [CA]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 27 - line 50; figures 4,5 * [Y] 4;
 [AY]US1646886  (COOPER TAYLOR EDWARD) [A] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 6