Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1875940

EP1875940 - Intravenous catheter introducing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2010
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shue, Ming-Jeng
No. 14, Lane 8 Chung-I Street Hsi District
Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Huang, Deborah
7F, No. 5, Sec.3, Liu-Chun E. St., Chung Dist.
Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Shue, Phillip
No. 14, Lane 8 Chung-I Street Hsi District
Taichung City / TW
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
Shue, Ming-Jeng
No. 14, Lane 8 Chung-I Street Hsi District
Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Huang, Deborah
7F, No. 5, Sec.3, Liu-Chun E. St., Chung Dist.
Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Shue, Philip
No. 14, Lane 8 Chung-I Street Hsi District
Taichung City / TW
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
Shue, Ming-Jeng
No. 14, Lane 8 Chung-I St. Hsi Dist
Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Huang, Deborah
7F, No. 5, Sec.3, Liu-Chun E. St., Chung Dist.
Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Shue, Philip
No. 14, Lane 8 Chung-I Street Hsi District
Taichung City / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/02]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Former [2008/02]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Application number, filing date07018178.901.07.2004
[2008/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1875940
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1875940
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1875940
Date:03.02.2010
[2010/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06
[2008/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/02]
TitleGerman:Intravenöse Kathetereinführvorrichtung[2008/02]
English:Intravenous catheter introducing device[2008/02]
French:Dispositif d'introduction intraveineuse d'un cathéter[2008/02]
Examination procedure03.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
30.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2009Fee for grant paid
07.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04253967.6  / EP1611916
Opposition(s)22.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
TR21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
GB01.07.2010
IE01.07.2010
LU01.07.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
GB01.07.2010
IE01.07.2010
LU01.07.2010
Former [2012/42]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
GB01.07.2010
IE01.07.2010
Former [2012/37]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
GB01.07.2010
IE01.07.2010
Former [2011/35]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
GB01.07.2010
IE01.07.2010
Former [2011/19]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2011/06]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/42]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/29]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/27]FI21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/19]ES01.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9705912  (FH FAULDING & CO LIMITED ; FAUGHNDER DAVID JAMES (US); ROHRBOUGH JOHN) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 7, line 2; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5575773  (SONG JERNG S ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 26; figures 2,6,7 *;
 [A]US6325781  (SUZUKI HITOSHI ET AL) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 19-46; figures 1-3,5 * * column 6, line 20 - column 8, line 61; figures 8-12 *;
 [A]US6547762  (BARKER JOHN ET AL) [A] 1 * column 11, line 29 - column 15, line 26; figures 13-17 *;
 [A]WO0241932  (POPOV SERGEY ; SERPOMED LTD (IL)) [A] 1 * page 10, line 14 - page 12, line 17; figures 1-6 *