Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1880869

EP1880869 - Method for manufacturing a laminated decorative strip having a relief structure and comprising an aluminium layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/04]Laminated decorative strip having a relief structure and comprising an aluminium layer and method for manufacturing thereof
[2009/44]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samvardhana Motherson Innovative Autosystems B.V. & Co. KG
Postfach 1207
96244 Michelau / DE
[2018/08]
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
Kunststoff-Technik Scherer & Trier GmbH & Co. KG
Siemensstrasse 8
96247 Michelau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reissenweber, Dirk
Sulzenstrasse 4
96237 Ebersdorf / DE
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB , et al
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[2018/24]
Former [2008/04]Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date07018211.813.01.2004
[2008/04]
Priority number, dateDE2003100091913.01.2003         Original published format: DE 10300919
DE20032000435U13.01.2003         Original published format: DE 20300435 U
[2008/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1880869
Date:23.01.2008
Language:DE
[2008/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1880869
Date:03.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/09]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1880869
Date:13.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/14, B32B15/08, B32B17/10, B32B27/36, B60R13/00, B60R13/02, B60R13/04
[2008/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/24]
Former [2008/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für ein mehrlagiges Dekorband mit einer Reliefstruktur und einer Aluminiumschicht[2009/44]
English:Method for manufacturing a laminated decorative strip having a relief structure and comprising an aluminium layer[2009/44]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un ruban de décoration multicouches en relief comprenant une couche d'aluminium[2009/44]
Former [2008/04]Mehrlagiges Dekorband mit einer Reliefstruktur und einer Aluminiumschicht und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung
Former [2008/04]Laminated decorative strip having a relief structure and comprising an aluminium layer and method for manufacturing thereof
Former [2008/04]Ruban de décoration multicouches en relief comprenant une couche d'aluminium et procédé de fabrication associé
Examination procedure17.09.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
21.05.2008Observations by third parties
14.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2010Fee for grant paid
21.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04701588.8  / EP1587694
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.12.2010  10.12.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Weidplas GmbH
Neue Jonastrasse 60
8640 Rapperswil / CH
Opponent's representative
Detken, Andreas, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2016/22]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2010  10.12.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Weidplas GmbH
Neue Jonastrasse 60
8640 Rapperswil / CH
Opponent's representative
Detken, Andreas, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Former [2012/46]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2010  10.12.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Weidmann Plastics Technology AG
Neue Jonastrasse 60
8640 Rapperswil / CH
Opponent's representative
Detken, Andreas, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Former [2011/02]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2010   
Weidmann Plastics Technology AG
Neue Jonastrasse 60
8640 Rapperswil / CH
Opponent's representative
Groner, Manfred, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
20.01.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.12.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.04.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition01.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0268/13
23.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
07.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
07.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Stay/Interruption01.06.2014Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2016/40]
03.04.2017Resumption of proceedings[2016/40]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
AT13.01.2014
CZ13.01.2014
SE14.01.2014
IT13.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/28]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
AT13.01.2014
CZ13.01.2014
SE14.01.2014
IT13.01.2017
ES14.01.2017
Former [2018/14]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
AT13.01.2014
CZ13.01.2014
SE14.01.2014
IT13.01.2017
Former [2014/51]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
AT13.01.2014
CZ13.01.2014
SE14.01.2014
Former [2014/50]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
CZ13.01.2014
SE14.01.2014
Former [2014/48]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
CZ13.01.2014
Former [2013/45]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
Former [2013/44]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
LU13.01.2011
BE31.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
Former [2011/19]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
PT05.07.2010
Former [2011/06]CY03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IE03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
Former [2010/45]FI03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
Former [2010/42]FI03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE3147043  (ALUMINIUM-WALZWERKE SINGEN GMBH) [YD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3980512  (JAN AXEL INGEMAR RAUSER) [Y] 1-18 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 49; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1129952  (CANSOL AG) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB930062  (MAY & BAKER LIMITED) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4231831  (JAMES L. GEBHARDT) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3940628  (VEB HAUSHALTGERÄTE KARL-MARX-STADT) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
ExaminationDE19924604
 GB1533658
by applicantDE3147043
 US3980512
otherDE19924604
 GB1533658
OppositionGB1076033
 US4253597
 DE1800639U
 DE20016842U
 DE28130636U
 GB2360011
 US3565734
 JPH0426290
 US3136676
 US1856928
 US3780152
 DE1288298
 US3246066
 US4220681