Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1906002

EP1906002 - Automobile fuel saver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2011  [2011/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pottery Trading USA, Inc.
402 W. Broadway Suite 400 San Diego
CA 92101 California / US
[2008/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Lai, Chieh-Jung
5F, No. 48, Sec. 2, Huanhe E. Rd.
Younghe City, Taipei County 234 / TW
 [2008/14]
Representative(s)Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/14]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07018391.819.09.2007
[2008/14]
Priority number, dateCN20062046194U22.09.2006         Original published format: CN 200620046194 U
US2006064744229.12.2006         Original published format: US 647442
[2008/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1906002
Date:02.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:F02M27/06
[2008/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/14]
TitleGerman:Brennstoffsparvorrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug[2008/14]
English:Automobile fuel saver[2008/14]
French:Économiseur de carburant automobile[2008/14]
Examination procedure27.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
09.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/39]
10.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0006888  (RICCOBONO DARIO [IT]; SALEMI PAOLO [IT]; CHANG SOO KIM BUDDY [CA]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 2; figures 6,7 *;
 [X]US6024073  (BUTT DAVID J [CA]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 5 - column 8, line 51; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE4417167  (KO EUN HAK [KR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 14; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]JPH11125157  (KURATOMI YASURO) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2003074424  (PLAN TEC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *