Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2042991

EP2042991 - Method of detecting abnormal use of a non volatile memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2011
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2011  [2011/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEMALTO Pte Ltd
12 Ayer Rajah Crescent
Singapore 139941 / SG
[2009/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Lichao
Jurong west Blk824, street 81
04-446 Singapore / SG
02 / Ng, Poh Chang
Block 26n[deg]22-01 Bukit Batok Street 52
659247 Singapore / SG
03 / Uy, Mark Julius
Block 109
Commonwealth Crescent n. 08-268
140109 Singapore / SG
 [2011/02]
Former [2009/14]01 / Chen, Lichao
Jurong west Blk824, street 81
04-446 Singapore / SG
02 / Ng, Uen Jye
Blk 711 n.10-124/Tampines
520711 Singapore / SG
03 / Uy, Mark Julius
Block 109
Commonwealth Crescent n. 08-268
140109 Singapore / SG
Representative(s)Brun, Philippe Alexandre Georges , et al
Gemplus - Intellectual Property Department Av du Jujubier, ZI Athélia IV
13705 La Ciotat cedex / FR
[2009/14]
Application number, filing date07018796.825.09.2007
[2009/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2042991
Date:01.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00
[2009/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erkennung von abnormaler Verwendung eines nichtflüchtigen Speichers[2009/14]
English:Method of detecting abnormal use of a non volatile memory[2009/14]
French:Procédé pour la détection de l'utilisation anormale d'une mémoire non volatile[2009/14]
Examination procedure01.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
02.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/36]
19.04.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0573435  (OKI DENKI NAGANO KK; OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * An automated computer translation of this Japanese publication can be found on the website of the Japanese Patent Office http://www.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0010] * * Interpretation of abstract based on automated translation of Japanese Patent * * figures 1,2,5 *;
 [X]JP2002184193  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-15 * An automated computer translation of this Japanese publication can be found on the website of the Japanese Patent Office http://www.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0008] , [0009] , [0013] * * figure 1 * * Interpretation of abstract based on automated translation of Japanese Patent *;
 [X]JPH08138389  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * An automated computer translation of this Japanese publication can be found on the website of the Japanese Patent Office http://www.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] * * figure 1 * * Interpretation of abstract based on automated translation of Japanese Patent *