blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1909384

EP1909384 - Rectifier circuit with variable capacitor, semiconductor device using the circuit, and driving method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]For all designated states
SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD.
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Osada, Takeshi
Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
 [2008/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07019156.428.09.2007
[2008/15]
Priority number, dateJP2006027456706.10.2006         Original published format: JP 2006274567
[2008/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1909384
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1909384
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2015
ClassificationIPC:H02M7/06, G06K19/07
[2015/48]
CPC:
H02M7/06 (EP,US); H02M1/08 (KR); G06K19/0715 (EP,US);
H02M7/4818 (EP,US); Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2008/15]H02M7/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL [2016/25]
Former [2008/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gleichrichterschaltung mit variabler Kapazität, Halbleiter mit dieser Schaltung und Ansteuerungsverfahren dafür[2008/15]
English:Rectifier circuit with variable capacitor, semiconductor device using the circuit, and driving method therefor[2008/15]
French:Circuit de redresseur avec capacité variable, semi-conducteur utilisant le circuit, et méthode de commande[2008/15]
Examination procedure12.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/25]
26.05.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.07.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/21]
17.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201812   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB2307379  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,23,24,46 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 7 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 6; figure 1 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 16 * * page 12, line 3 - line 6 * * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 14 * * page 15, line 17 - line 20; figure 3 * [I] 2,5,8,11,15,19,25,28,31,34,38,42;
 [A]US6134130  (CONNELL LAWRENCE EDWIN [US], et al) [A] 1-46* page 6, line 14 - page 9, line 17; figures 1-3 *;
 [XI]US6212431  (HAHN TAE W [US], et al) [X] 1,23,24,46 * column 3, line 19 - line 25 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 21 * [I] 2,5,8,11,15,19,25,28,31,34,38,42
ExaminationWO03079524
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.