Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1912045

EP1912045 - Device for measuring ionising radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berthold Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Calmbacher Strasse 22
75323 Bad Wildbad / DE
[2008/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Mörmann, Dirk, Dr.
Eichelbergstraße 1
76476 Bischweier / DE
02 / Hirsch, Stephan
Badenerstraße 16
68239 Mannheim / DE
03 / Freiburger, Ewald
Rotstraße 1
75245 Neulingen / DE
 [2008/16]
Representative(s)Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwälte Frank Wacker Schön Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2008/16]Frank, Gerhard , et al
Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date07019432.904.10.2007
[2008/16]
Priority number, dateDE2006104826612.10.2006         Original published format: DE102006048266
[2008/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1912045
Date:16.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1912045
Date:01.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/288, G01T1/20
[2008/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/16]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Messen ionisierender Strahlung[2008/16]
English:Device for measuring ionising radiation[2008/16]
French:Dispositif de mesure d'un rayonnement ionisant[2008/16]
Examination procedure10.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/48]
06.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2012Fee for grant paid
09.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2008
Opposition(s)03.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.10.2007
CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
TR01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
LU04.10.2012
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
FR31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GB01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
TR01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
LU04.10.2012
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
FR31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GB01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2014/21]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
TR01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
FR31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GB01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2014/09]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
FR31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GB01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/51]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
FR31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GB01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/40]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
FR31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/35]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/34]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG01.11.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/33]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
CH31.10.2012
LI31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/24]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/23]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
RO01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
SK01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/22]CY01.08.2012
CZ01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
EE01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/21]CY01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/15]CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/13]CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
PL01.08.2012
SI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
IS01.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
Former [2013/08]LT01.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE20103881U  (BERTHOLD TECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0982602  (SAINT GOBAIN NORTON IND CERAMI [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0065]; figure - *;
 [A]WO0181950  (DIMASON [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 9 - page 12, line 3; figure - *
by applicantDE20103881U
 EP0982602
 WO0181950