Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026399

EP2026399 - Membraneless micro fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.11.2012  [2012/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology
373-1 Gusung-dong Yuseong-ku
Daejeon, 305-701 / KR
[2011/26]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology
373-1 Gusung-Dong
Yuseong-Gu, Daejeon 305-701 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Sung, Hyung-Jin
KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong
Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
02 / Yoon, Sang-Youl
300-13, Jangjeon 3(sam)-dong
Geumjeong-gu
Busan, 609-393 / KR
03 / Dewan, Hasan Ahmed
Apt. 3105, Dept. of Mechanical Eng.
KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong
Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
04 / Park, Hong-Beom
Apt. 3105, Dept. of Mechanical Eng.
KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong
Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
 [2011/51]
Former [2011/26]01 / Sung, Hyung-Jin
KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong, Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
02 / Yoon, Sang-Youl
300-13, Jangjeon 3(sam)-dong, Geumjeong-gu
Busan, 609-393 / KR
03 / Dewan, Hasan Ahmed
Apt. 3105, Dept. of Mechanical Eng., KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong, Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
04 / Park, Hong-Beom
Apt. 3105, Dept. of Mechanical Eng., KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong, Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
Former [2009/08]01 / Sung, Hyung-Jin
KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong, Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
02 / Yoon, Sang-Youl
300-13, Jangjeon 3(sam)-dong, Geumjeong-gu
Busan, 609-393 / KR
03 / Dewan, Hasan Ahmed
Apt. 3105 KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong, Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
04 / Park, Hong-Beom
Apt. 3105 KAIST, 373-1, Gusung-dong, Yuseong-ku
Daejon, 305-701 / KR
Representative(s)Schweitzer, Klaus , et al
Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[2009/08]
Application number, filing date07019770.210.10.2007
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateKR2007008027009.08.2007         Original published format: KR 20070080270
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026399
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026399
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/86, H01M8/04, H01M8/24, H01M8/02
[2010/25]
Former International [2009/08]H01M8/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Membranlose Mikrobrennstoffzelle[2009/08]
English:Membraneless micro fuel cell[2009/08]
French:Micro pile à combustible sans membrane[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2011Fee for grant paid
29.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2009
Opposition(s)24.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006003217  (COHEN JAMIE L [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005004262  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [A] 33-72 * abstract * * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO2006104522  (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [A] 33-72 * paragraph [0016] * * figure 1 *
 [XA]  - CHOBAN E R ET AL, "Microfluidic fuel cell based on laminar flow", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040329), vol. 128, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 54 - 60, XP004493639 [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11,16,17,26,27 * pages 55-59 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 33-72

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2003.11.052